HUNLEY et al v. Instagram, LLC Featured Case

Plaintiffs Alexis Hunley and Matthew Scott Brauer filed a complaint for damages based on copyright infringement against Defendant Instagram, LLC. Plaintiffs alleged that Instagram is secondarily liable for copyright infringement by encouraging third-party publishers, such as BuzzFeed.com, Time.com, and Mashable.com, to embed posts from Instagram without a license, permission or valid legal defense from the copyright owner.

Plaintiff: MATTHEW SCOTT BRAUER and ALEXIS HUNLEY
Defendant: Instagram, LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv03778
Filed: May 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles R Breyer
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Annie A Lee (Lee, Annie) (Filed on 7/16/2021)
July 16, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Allyson Roz Bennett (Bennett, Allyson) (Filed on 7/16/2021)
July 16, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Charles Gratz (Gratz, Joseph) (Filed on 7/16/2021)
July 16, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Ragesh K. Tangri (Tangri, Ragesh) (Filed on 7/16/2021)
July 16, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Instagram, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 8/20/2021 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Responses due by 7/30/2021. Replies due by 8/6/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Allyson R. Bennett in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Complaint, #2 Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint)(Gratz, Joseph) (Filed on 7/16/2021)
June 24, 2021 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Instagram, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Facebook, Inc. for Instagram, LLC. (Gratz, Joseph) (Filed on 6/24/2021)
June 17, 2021 Filing 14 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, filed by Instagram, LLC. (Gratz, Joseph) (Filed on 6/17/2021)
June 3, 2021 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE: A Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/1/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/8/2021 at 8:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2021)
June 3, 2021 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by MATTHEW SCOTT BRAUER, ALEXIS HUNLEY Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint on Instagram, LLC (Cera, Solomon) (Filed on 6/3/2021)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Charles R. Breyer for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 06/03/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2021)
June 2, 2021 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2021)
June 2, 2021 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by MATTHEW SCOTT BRAUER, ALEXIS HUNLEY.. (Cera, Solomon) (Filed on 6/2/2021)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #7 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Bryan Hoben representing Plaintiffs. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2021)
May 20, 2021 Filing 7 First MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15992388.) filed by MATTHEW SCOTT BRAUER, ALEXIS HUNLEY. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing SDNY)(Hoben, Bryan) (Filed on 5/20/2021)
May 20, 2021 Filing 6 REPORT on the filing of an action regarding Copyright (cc: form emailed to register). (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2021)
May 20, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Instagram, LLC. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2021)
May 20, 2021 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/12/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/19/2021 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2021)
May 20, 2021 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/3/2021. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2021)
May 19, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Cera, Solomon) (Filed on 5/19/2021)
May 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages Based on Copyright Infringement against Instagram, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15988062.). Filed byALEXIS HUNLEY, MATTHEW SCOTT BRAUER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cera, Solomon) (Filed on 5/19/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HUNLEY et al v. Instagram, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Instagram, LLC
Represented By: Allyson Roz Bennett
Represented By: Annie A Lee
Represented By: Joseph Charles Gratz
Represented By: Ragesh K. Tangri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MATTHEW SCOTT BRAUER
Represented By: Solomon B. Cera
Represented By: Adrian R. Bacon
Represented By: James Henry Bartolomei, III
Represented By: Pamela Ann Markert
Represented By: Thomas C. Bright
Represented By: Todd Michael Friedman
Represented By: Bryan Daniel Hoben
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALEXIS HUNLEY
Represented By: Solomon B. Cera
Represented By: Adrian R. Bacon
Represented By: James Henry Bartolomei, III
Represented By: Pamela Ann Markert
Represented By: Thomas C. Bright
Represented By: Todd Michael Friedman
Represented By: Bryan Daniel Hoben
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?