Hoang v. ContextLogic, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Yen Hoang
Defendant: Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Stephanie Tilenius, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Joe Lonsdale, Tanzeen Syed, Brett Just, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Peter Szulczewski, Ari Emanuel, Rajat Bahri, Hans Tung, Oppenheimer & Co. Inc., Julie Bradley, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, L.L.C., Jacqueline Reses, Academy Securities, Inc., Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC, UBS Securities LLC, BofA Securities, Inc., ContextLogic, Inc., R. Seelaus & Co., LLC, Cowen and Company, LLC, Loop Capital Markets LLC and RBC Capital Markets, LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv03930
Filed: May 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Maxine M Chesney
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION REGARDING SERVICE AND RESPONDING TO THE COMPLAINT; VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 8, 2021. (mmclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2021)
June 7, 2021 Filing 23 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER REGARDING SERVICE AND RESPONDING TO THE COMPLAINT filed by Yen Hoang. (Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 6/7/2021)
June 7, 2021 Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Rajat Bahri on 5/27/2021, filed by Yen Hoang. (Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 6/7/2021)
June 7, 2021 Filing 21 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Goldman Sachs & Co., LLC on 5/28/2021, filed by Yen Hoang. (Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 6/7/2021)
June 3, 2021 Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on UBS Securities LLC on 5/28/2021, filed by Yen Hoang. (Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 6/3/2021)
June 3, 2021 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Stifel, Nicolaus & Co., Inc. on 5/28/2021, filed by Yen Hoang. (Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 6/3/2021)
June 3, 2021 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on R. Seelaus & Co., LLC on 5/28/2021, filed by Yen Hoang. (Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 6/3/2021)
June 3, 2021 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on RBC Capital Markets, LLC on 5/27/2021, filed by Yen Hoang. (Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 6/3/2021)
June 3, 2021 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Oppenheimer & Co. Inc. on 5/28/2021, filed by Yen Hoang. (Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 6/3/2021)
June 3, 2021 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Loop Capital Markets LLC on 5/28/2021, filed by Yen Hoang. (Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 6/3/2021)
June 3, 2021 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Julie Bradley on 5/28/2021, filed by Yen Hoang. (Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 6/3/2021)
June 3, 2021 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on J.P. Morgan Securities LLC on 5/28/2021, filed by Yen Hoang. (Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 6/3/2021)
June 3, 2021 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Deutsche Bank Securities Inc. on 5/28/2021, filed by Yen Hoang. (Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 6/3/2021)
June 3, 2021 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC on 5/28/2021, filed by Yen Hoang. (Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 6/3/2021)
June 3, 2021 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Cowen and Company LLC on 5/27/2021, filed by Yen Hoang. (Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 6/3/2021)
June 3, 2021 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on ContextLogic Inc. on 5/28/2021, filed by Yen Hoang. (Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 6/3/2021)
June 3, 2021 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Citigroup Global Markets, Inc. on 5/28/2021, filed by Yen Hoang. (Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 6/3/2021)
June 3, 2021 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on BofA Secs., Inc. on 5/28/2021, filed by Yen Hoang. (Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 6/3/2021)
June 3, 2021 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Academy Secs., Inc. on 5/28/2021, filed by Yen Hoang. (Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 6/3/2021)
May 26, 2021 Filing 5 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER SEC CLASS ACTION Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. SEC Class Action Notice due by 6/15/2021. Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/20/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/27/2021 at 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2021)
May 26, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Defendants Academy Securities, Inc., Rajat Bahri, BofA Securities, Inc., Julie Bradley, Citigroup Global Markets Inc., ContextLogic, Inc., Cowen and Company, LLC, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Ari Emanuel, Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Brett Just, Joe Lonsdale, Loop Capital Markets LLC, Oppenheimer & Co. Inc., R. Seelaus & Co., LLC, RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Jacqueline Reses, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, L.L.C., Tanzeen Syed, Peter Szulczewski, Stephanie Tilenius, Hans Tung, UBS Securities LLC. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2021)
May 25, 2021 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2021)
May 25, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 5/25/2021)
May 25, 2021 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT; JURY TRIAL DEMANDED against Academy Securities, Inc., Rajat Bahri, BofA Securities, Inc., Julie Bradley, Citigroup Global Markets Inc., ContextLogic, Inc., Cowen and Company, LLC, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Ari Emanuel, Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Brett Just, Joe Lonsdale, Loop Capital Markets LLC, Oppenheimer & Co. Inc., R. Seelaus & Co., LLC, RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Jacqueline Reses, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, L.L.C., Tanzeen Syed, Peter Szulczewski, Stephanie Tilenius, Hans Tung, UBS Securities LLC, (Filing Fee: $402.00, receipt number 0971-16007287). Filed by Yen Hoang. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 5/25/2021) Modified on 5/26/2021 (tnS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hoang v. ContextLogic, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citigroup Global Markets Inc.
Represented By: Charlene Sachi Shimada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Tilenius
Represented By: Brian Michael Lutz
Represented By: Michael James Kahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Securities LLC
Represented By: Charlene Sachi Shimada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Lonsdale
Represented By: Brian Michael Lutz
Represented By: Michael James Kahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tanzeen Syed
Represented By: Brian Michael Lutz
Represented By: Michael James Kahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brett Just
Represented By: Brian Michael Lutz
Represented By: Michael James Kahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.
Represented By: Charlene Sachi Shimada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC
Represented By: Charlene Sachi Shimada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Szulczewski
Represented By: Brian Michael Lutz
Represented By: Michael James Kahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ari Emanuel
Represented By: Brian Michael Lutz
Represented By: Michael James Kahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rajat Bahri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hans Tung
Represented By: Brian Michael Lutz
Represented By: Michael James Kahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oppenheimer & Co. Inc.
Represented By: Charlene Sachi Shimada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Bradley
Represented By: Brian Michael Lutz
Represented By: Michael James Kahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, L.L.C.
Represented By: Charlene Sachi Shimada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacqueline Reses
Represented By: Brian Michael Lutz
Represented By: Michael James Kahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Academy Securities, Inc.
Represented By: Charlene Sachi Shimada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC
Represented By: Charlene Sachi Shimada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UBS Securities LLC
Represented By: Charlene Sachi Shimada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BofA Securities, Inc.
Represented By: Charlene Sachi Shimada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ContextLogic, Inc.
Represented By: Brian Michael Lutz
Represented By: Michael James Kahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Seelaus & Co., LLC
Represented By: Charlene Sachi Shimada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cowen and Company, LLC
Represented By: Charlene Sachi Shimada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loop Capital Markets LLC
Represented By: Charlene Sachi Shimada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RBC Capital Markets, LLC
Represented By: Charlene Sachi Shimada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yen Hoang
Represented By: John T. Jasnoch
Represented By: Jonathan M. Zimmerman
Represented By: Thomas L Laughlin, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?