Smith v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Jacqlyn L. Smith
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul and Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 3:2021cv04248
Filed: June 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1383
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2021 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Andrew M. Saul.. (Banks, Andrea) (Filed on 7/28/2021)
June 10, 2021 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Jacqlyn L. Smith.. (Sackett, Harvey) (Filed on 6/10/2021)
June 9, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Andrew M. Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2021) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/9/2021: #1 usm, #2 usm, #3 usm) (hdjS, COURT STAFF).
June 9, 2021 Emailed re receipt of orders,cmp,summons, and waiver from SSA office (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2021)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2021)
June 4, 2021 Filing 4 SOCIAL SECURITY PROCEDURAL ORDER (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2021)
June 4, 2021 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/18/2021. (asS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2021)
June 3, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jacqlyn L. Smith. (Sackett, Harvey) (Filed on 6/3/2021)
June 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW OF DECISION OF COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY against Andrew M. Saul. Filed byJacqlyn L. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sackett, Harvey) (Filed on 6/3/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqlyn L. Smith
Represented By: Harvey Peter Sackett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Andrea Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Andrea Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?