Thryv, Inc. v. International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Local 1269
Plaintiff: Thryv, Inc.
Defendant: International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Local 1269
Case Number: 3:2021cv04280
Filed: June 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Joseph C Spero
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Local 1269. Service waived by International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Local 1269 waiver sent on 6/14/2021, answer due 8/13/2021. (Baker, Andrew) (Filed on 7/13/2021)
June 21, 2021 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Thryv, Inc... (Kwan, Sophia) (Filed on 6/21/2021)
June 21, 2021 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 7/6/2021. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2021)
June 4, 2021 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 8/27/202 1. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/3/2021 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2021)
June 4, 2021 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/18/2021. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2021)
June 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Local 1269 ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-16044229.). Filed byThryv, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kwan, Sophia) (Filed on 6/4/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thryv, Inc. v. International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Local 1269
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Local 1269
Represented By: Andrew H. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thryv, Inc.
Represented By: Arthur G. Telegen
Represented By: Sophia S Kwan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?