Mohanna v. Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Plaintiff: Keyhan Mohanna
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Case Number: 3:2021cv04530
Filed: June 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2021 Filing 14 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against Deutsche Bank National Trust Company. Filed by Keyhan Mohanna. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2021)
August 5, 2021 Filing 13 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company.. (Woods, Thomas) (Filed on 8/5/2021)
August 5, 2021 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant Deutsche Bank national Trust Company shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by August 19, 2021. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (ahmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE TO PLAINTIFF. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 8/5/2021. Show Cause Response due by 8/19/2021. (ahmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)Order emailed to plaintiff on keyhan6@yahoo.com on 8/5/2021.
August 4, 2021 Filing 10 Statement of Non-Opposition to re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company. (Related document(s) #5 ) (Woods, Thomas) (Filed on 8/4/2021)
July 16, 2021 Filing 9 Clerk's DECLINATION OF DEFAULT as to Deutsche Bank National Trust Company. A responsive pleading was filed at docket number #5 . (Related documents(s) #8 )(wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
July 16, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Entry of Default filed by Keyhan Mohanna. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Envelope)(wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2021)
July 16, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Keyhan Mohanna. Deutsche Bank National Trust Company served on 6/18/2021, answer due 7/9/2021. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2021)
July 14, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company (Woods, Thomas) (Filed on 7/14/2021)
July 14, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(6); MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company. Motion Hearing set for 8/26/2021 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Responses due by 7/28/2021. Replies due by 8/4/2021. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Proposed Order)(Woods, Thomas) (Filed on 7/14/2021)
June 21, 2021 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge filed by Keyhan Mohanna. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2021)
June 11, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Deutsche Bank National Trust Company. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2021)
June 11, 2021 Filing 2 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/2/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/9/2021 at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (Attachments: #1 JSC Civil Standing Order and Standing Order for All Judges)(tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
June 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for 1. WRONGFUL FORECLOSURE; 2. VIOLATION OF U.C.C. 3302, Et Seq.; and 3. VIOLATION OF 11 U.S.C. 362; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, (Filing Fee: $402.00, receipt number 34611154813). Filed by Keyhan Mohanna. Consent/Declination due by 6/25/2021. (Attachments: #(1) Civil Cover Sheet, #(2) Filing Fee Receipt, #(3) Envelope) (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mohanna v. Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keyhan Mohanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Represented By: Thomas Andrew Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?