Suski v. Coinbase Global, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: David Suski
Defendant: Marden-Kane, Inc. and Coinbase Global, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv04539
Filed: June 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2021 Filing 9 Certificate of Interested Entities by David Suski Pursuant to Civil L.R. 3-15 (Harris, David) (Filed on 6/22/2021)
June 22, 2021 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by David Suski.. (Harris, David) (Filed on 6/22/2021)
June 14, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Marden-Kane, Inc.. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2021)
June 14, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Coinbase Global, Inc.. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2021)
June 14, 2021 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/6/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/13/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order)(msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2021)
June 14, 2021 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/28/2021. (asS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2021)
June 11, 2021 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Harris, David) (Filed on 6/11/2021)
June 11, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Harris, David) (Filed on 6/11/2021)
June 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Class Action Complaint with Jury Demand against Coinbase Global, Inc., Marden-Kane, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-16070254.). Filed byDavid Suski. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Case Cover Sheet)(Harris, David) (Filed on 6/11/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Suski v. Coinbase Global, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marden-Kane, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coinbase Global, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Suski
Represented By: David J. Harris, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?