W.J. et al v. Chart Inc.
Plaintiff: W.J. and X.J.
Defendant: Chart Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv04672
Filed: June 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2021 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to the case. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2021)
June 22, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Chart Inc.. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2021)
June 22, 2021 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/13/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/20/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2021)
June 21, 2021 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/6/2021. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2021)
June 18, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by W.J., X.J. . (Zeman, Amy) (Filed on 6/18/2021)
June 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Chart Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-16088086.). Filed byW.J., X.J.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Interested Entities or Persons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Zeman, Amy) (Filed on 6/17/2021)
June 17, 2021 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect Revision of Civil Cover Sheet used [err201]. Current Revision is JS-CAND 44 (Rev. 10/20). No judge assignment will be made until the d ocument is e-filed. Please complete correct Civil Cover Sheet and e-file an Amended Civil Cover Sheet only. Event is located at: Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover Sheet. Re: #1 Complaint, filed by X.J., W.J. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: W.J. et al v. Chart Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: W.J.
Represented By: Amy Marie Zeman
Represented By: Adam E. Polk
Represented By: Dena C. Sharp
Represented By: Eric H. Gibbs
Represented By: Nina Gliozzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: X.J.
Represented By: Amy Marie Zeman
Represented By: Adam E. Polk
Represented By: Dena C. Sharp
Represented By: Eric H. Gibbs
Represented By: Nina Gliozzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chart Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?