Jalili-Farshchi et al v. Aldersly et al
Plaintiff: Jila Jalili-Farshchi, Shahla Forouzin, Shida Jalili-Farshchi and Mohammad N. Jalili-Farshchi
Defendant: Life Care Services, LLC, Life Care Services Corporation, LCS Holdings, Inc., Aldersly Retirement Community, Inc., Cahill Contractors, Inc., Life Care Management Services, Inc., Does 1 through 100, inclusive, Cahill Contractors, LLC and Aldersly
Case Number: 3:2021cv04727
Filed: June 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: James Donato
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2021 Filing 17 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #14 MOTION to Remand ) filed byAldersly, Aldersly Retirement Community, Inc., LCS Holdings, Inc., Life Care Management Services, Inc., Life Care Services Corporation, Life Care Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Request for Judicial Notice ISO Motion to Dismiss)(Jacobson, Reuben) (Filed on 7/30/2021)
July 27, 2021 Filing 16 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #9 MOTION to Dismiss , #14 MOTION to Remand re: Stay Until Appellate Issues Decided filed by Shahla Forouzin, Jila Jalili-Farshchi, Mohammad N. Jalili-Farshchi, Shida Jalili-Farshchi. (Hale, Michael) (Filed on 7/27/2021)
July 27, 2021 Filing 15 Certificate of Service re #14 Motion to Remand filed by Shahla Forouzin, Jila Jalili-Farshchi, Mohammad N. Jalili-Farshchi, Shida Jalili-Farshchi. Motion Hearing set for 8/26/2021 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 8/12/2021. Replies due by 8/19/2021. (Hale, Michael) (Filed on 7/27/2021) Modified on 7/29/2021 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
July 21, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION to Remand filed by Shahla Forouzin, Jila Jalili-Farshchi, Mohammad N. Jalili-Farshchi, Shida Jalili-Farshchi. Motion Hearing set for 8/26/2021 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 8/4/2021. Replies due by 8/11/2021. (Granahan, Conor) (Filed on 7/21/2021)
July 8, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion Hearing set for 9/9/2021 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2021)
July 8, 2021 Filing 13 STIPULATION re #9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Shahla Forouzin, Jila Jalili-Farshchi, Mohammad N. Jalili-Farshchi, Shida Jalili-Farshchi. (Hale, Michael) (Filed on 7/8/2021)
July 6, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Rita Rebecca Kanno (Kanno, Rita) (Filed on 7/6/2021)
July 6, 2021 Filing 11 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Aldersly, Aldersly Retirement Community, Inc., LCS Holdings, Inc., Life Care Management Services, Inc., Life Care Services Corporation, Life Care Services, LLC. (Jacobson, Reuben) (Filed on 7/6/2021)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/30/2021 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 9/23/2021. Signed by Judge James Donato on 6/29/2021. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2021)
June 28, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Aldersly, Aldersly Retirement Community, Inc., LCS Holdings, Inc., Life Care Management Services, Inc., Life Care Services Corporation, Life Care Services, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 8/5/2021 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 7/12/2021. Replies due by 7/19/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss, #2 Request for Judicial Notice ISO Motion to Dismiss)(Jacobson, Reuben) (Filed on 6/28/2021) Modified on 6/28/2021 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge James Donato for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 06/28/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2021)
June 25, 2021 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2021)
June 24, 2021 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Aldersly, Aldersly Retirement Community, Inc., LCS Holdings, Inc., Life Care Management Services, Inc., Life Care Services Corporation, Life Care Services, LLC.. (Jacobson, Reuben) (Filed on 6/24/2021)
June 24, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Aldersly, Aldersly Retirement Community, Inc., LCS Holdings, Inc., Life Care Management Services, Inc., Life Care Services Corporation, Life Care Services, LLC RE: Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines (Jacobson, Reuben) (Filed on 6/24/2021)
June 23, 2021 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/13/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/20/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2021)
June 22, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Aldersly, Aldersly Retirement Community, Inc., LCS Holdings, Inc., Life Care Management Services, Inc., Life Care Services Corporation, Life Care Services, LLC re: Standing Order, et al. (Jacobson, Reuben) (Filed on 6/22/2021)
June 22, 2021 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/6/2021. (asS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2021)
June 21, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Francisco County Superior Court. Their Case Number is CGC-21-590582. (Filing fee $402.00, receipt number 0971-16097000). Filed by Aldersly Retirement Community, Inc., Life Care Management Services, Inc., Life Care Services Corporation, Life Care Services, LLC, LCS Holdings, Inc., Aldersly. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Adverse Party of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Certificate of Interested Parties, #4 Request for Judicial Notice, #5 Exhibits to RFJN, #6 Exhibits to RFJN, #7 Exhibits to RFJN) (Jacobson, Reuben) (Filed on 6/21/2021) Modified on 6/23/2021 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jalili-Farshchi et al v. Aldersly et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Care Services, LLC
Represented By: Reuben B. Jacobson
Represented By: Rita Rebecca Kanno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Care Services Corporation
Represented By: Reuben B. Jacobson
Represented By: Rita Rebecca Kanno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LCS Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Reuben B. Jacobson
Represented By: Rita Rebecca Kanno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aldersly Retirement Community, Inc.
Represented By: Reuben B. Jacobson
Represented By: Rita Rebecca Kanno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cahill Contractors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Care Management Services, Inc.
Represented By: Reuben B. Jacobson
Represented By: Rita Rebecca Kanno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cahill Contractors, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aldersly
Represented By: Reuben B. Jacobson
Represented By: Rita Rebecca Kanno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jila Jalili-Farshchi
Represented By: Michael Eric Hale
Represented By: Conor Daniel Granahan
Represented By: Frank Christian Liuzzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shahla Forouzin
Represented By: Michael Eric Hale
Represented By: Conor Daniel Granahan
Represented By: Frank Christian Liuzzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shida Jalili-Farshchi
Represented By: Michael Eric Hale
Represented By: Conor Daniel Granahan
Represented By: Frank Christian Liuzzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohammad N. Jalili-Farshchi
Represented By: Michael Eric Hale
Represented By: Conor Daniel Granahan
Represented By: Frank Christian Liuzzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?