McMullen v. FCA US LLC et al
Plaintiff: Patrick Walter McMullen
Defendant: FCA US LLC and Stoneridge Chrysler Jeep Dodge
Case Number: 3:2021cv04871
Filed: June 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles R Breyer
Referring Judge: Thomas S Hixson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2022 Filing 37 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/27/2022. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2022)
October 14, 2022 Filing 36 NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by Patrick Walter McMullen (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Judgment)(Dolin, Tionna) (Filed on 10/14/2022)
October 14, 2022 Filing 35 CLERK'S NOTICE: This morning counsel notified the court that Plaintiff has accepted Defendant's Rule 68 offer of judgment and will be filing a request for entry of judgment shortly. In light of this development, today's settlement conference before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu is VACATED. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2022)
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 CLERK'S NOTICE: On 8/3/2022, Plaintiff was ordered to provide a written demand by 9/30/2022 with a copy to Judge Ryu at DMRsettlement@cand.uscourts.gov [Docket No. 30.] On the same day, Plaintiff was ordered to provide an exchanged settlement conference statement and a confidential settlement letter by 10/4/2022. Judge Ryu has not received the demand or the settlement materials. Plaintiff is ordered to provide these by 9:00 AM on 10/11/2022 or the settlement conference may be cancelled. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2022)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer: granting #24 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Richard Louis Stuhlbarg terminated as to FCA, LLC. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2022)
August 8, 2022 Filing 32 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE on August 12, 2022 before the Honorable Charles R. Breyer. A Joint Case Management Statement due by 12/2/2022. Further Case Management Conference set for 12/9/2022 at 8:30 AM in San Francisco - To be determined. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2022)
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 10/14/2022 10:00 AM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Judge Ryu will conduct the settlement conference in her designated non-public Zoom Meeting "room." The non-public Zoom Meeting link is available on Judge Ryu's webpage, by going to: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/dmr, or Join ZoomGov Meeting by clicking the link or using the information below: https://cand-uscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1619494731?pwd=cnZyVXVqWExEZzcxcDBBdzRuLzVldz09 Meeting ID: 161 949 4731 Passcode: 030361 Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 8/3/2022. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2022)
August 3, 2022 Filing 30 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu: Settlement planning call held on 8/3/2022 in advance of 10/14/2022 Zoom settlement conference at 10:00 AM. Results: Plaintiff shall provide a written demand by 9/30/2022 with a copy to Judge Ryu at DMRsettlement@cand.uscourts.gov. Digital Recording Time: Not Recorded For Plaintiff: Tionna Dolin For Defendant: Sarah Marie Carlson Lambert (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/3/2022)
July 22, 2022 Filing 29 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu: Settlement planning call not held on 7/22/2022. Results: No appearance by defense (which may have been the result of a recent change in counsel). Judge Ryu will host a settlement planning call on 8/3/2022 09:30 AM in Oakland, - Telephonic Only. Counsel will receive call-in credentials by email.Digital Recording Time: Not Recorded For Plaintiff Attorney: Tionna Dolin For Defendants: No Appearance (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/22/2022)
July 18, 2022 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Gurpreet Sandhu (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sandhu, Gurpreet) (Filed on 7/18/2022)
July 15, 2022 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Spencer Peter Hugret (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hugret, Spencer) (Filed on 7/15/2022)
July 15, 2022 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Marie Carlson Lambert (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Lambert, Sarah) (Filed on 7/15/2022)
July 15, 2022 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Dean Sentlinger (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sentlinger, Eric) (Filed on 7/15/2022)
July 14, 2022 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101] The correct event is Motion to Substitute Attorney. The correct event can be found at Civil Events > Motions and Relate d Filings > Motions - General > Substitute Attorney. Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #24 Notice of Change In Counsel filed by FCA US LLC (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2022)
July 14, 2022 Filing 24 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Richard Louis Stuhlbarg (Stuhlbarg, Richard) (Filed on 7/14/2022) Modified on 7/15/2022 (jml, COURT STAFF).
June 22, 2022 Filing 23 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL by FCA US LLC (Ramia, Sean) (Filed on 6/22/2022) Modified on 6/23/2022 (jml, COURT STAFF).
June 21, 2022 Filing 22 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu: Settlement planning call held on 6/21/2022. Results: Counsel reported that defense of the case will be transferred to new counsel soon. Judge Ryu will convene another planning call on 7/22/2022 12:00 PM in Oakland, - Telephonic Only. Counsel will receive call-in credentials by email.Digital Recording Time: Not RecordedFor Plaintiff: Tionna Dolin For Defendant: Garrett Stanton (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/21/2022)
June 20, 2022 Filing 21 NOTICE of Disassociation of Counsel for Plaintiff by Patrick Walter McMullen. (Dolin, Tionna) (Filed on 6/20/2022) Modified on 6/21/2022 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
June 1, 2022 Filing 20 CLERK'S NOTICE: A Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/5/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/12/2022 at 8:30 AM in San Francisco - To be determined. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2022)
May 10, 2022 Filing 19 CLERK'S NOTICE: Notice is hereby given to all parties that Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu will convene a pre-settlement conference call to discuss timing and preparation for a settlement conference. Judge Ryu anticipates that the phone call will last approximately 20-30 minutes. The conference call shall take place on 6/21/2022 11:15 AM in Oakland, - Telephonic Only. Lead Counsel for all parties shall participate. Counsel will receive the call-in information via e-mail from Judge Ryu's courtroom deputy. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2022)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Settlement. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/5/2022. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2022)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying #12 Motion to Remand. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2022)
May 5, 2022 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu for Settlement. (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2022)
April 26, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Ariel S. Harman-Holmes (Harman-Holmes, Ariel) (Filed on 4/26/2022)
April 25, 2022 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING MOTION to Remand hearing set for May 6, 2022 before the Honorable Charles R. Breyer. The motion will be determined on the briefs. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2022)
April 11, 2022 Filing 14 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #12 MOTION to Remand ) filed byFCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Garrett Stanton, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O)(Stanton, Garrett) (Filed on 4/11/2022)
March 28, 2022 Filing 13 Request for Judicial Notice re #12 MOTION to Remand filed byPatrick Walter McMullen. (Related document(s) #12 ) (Kuemerle, Karin) (Filed on 3/28/2022)
March 28, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION to Remand filed by Patrick Walter McMullen. Motion Hearing set for 5/6/2022 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Responses due by 4/11/2022. Replies due by 4/18/2022. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Remand, #2 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Remand)(Kuemerle, Karin) (Filed on 3/28/2022)
February 10, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Karin Kuemerle (Kuemerle, Karin) (Filed on 2/10/2022)
January 29, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Change of Address by Tionna Grace Dolin (Dolin, Tionna) (Filed on 1/29/2022)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Charles R. Breyer for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 9/17/21. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2021)
September 16, 2021 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2021)
September 16, 2021 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Patrick Walter McMullen.. (Law, Daniel) (Filed on 9/16/2021)
September 16, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel A. Law (Law, Daniel) (Filed on 9/16/2021)
June 25, 2021 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/16/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/23/2021 10:00 AM. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2021)
June 25, 2021 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/9/2021. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2021)
June 25, 2021 #Electronic filing error. E-filer is reminded to enter the state court information in the case opening screen. All parties as named in the state court complaint should also be entered on the docket. Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #1 Notice of Removal,, filed by FCA US LLC. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2021)
June 24, 2021 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by FCA US LLC identifying Other Affiliate FCA North America Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate FCA Holdco B.V., Other Affiliate Stellantis, N.V. for FCA US LLC. (Stanton, Garrett) (Filed on 6/24/2021)
June 24, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by FCA US LLC . (Stanton, Garrett) (Filed on 6/24/2021)
June 24, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Alameda County Superior Court. Their case number is HG20079117. (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0971-16112535). Filed byFCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Richard L. Stuhlbarg ISO Removal, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q)(Stanton, Garrett) (Filed on 6/24/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McMullen v. FCA US LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Walter McMullen
Represented By: Tionna Grace Dolin
Represented By: Daniel A. Law
Represented By: Karin Kuemerle
Represented By: Ariel S. Harman-Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Garrett B Stanton
Represented By: Richard Louis Stuhlbarg
Represented By: Sean Anthony Ramia
Represented By: Eric Dean Sentlinger
Represented By: Gurpreet Sandhu
Represented By: Sarah Marie Carlson Lambert
Represented By: Spencer Peter Hugret
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stoneridge Chrysler Jeep Dodge
Represented By: Richard Louis Stuhlbarg
Represented By: Parris Hugh Schmidt
Represented By: Sean Anthony Ramia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?