The City of Columbia et al v. McKinsey & Company, Inc. United States
Plaintiff: The City of Russell Springs, The City of Columbia, The Fiscal Court of Russell County Kentucky and The City of Jamestown
Defendant: McKinsey & Company Inc United States and McKinsey & Company Inc. United States
Case Number: 3:2021cv04956
Filed: June 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles R Breyer
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2021 Filing 9 Case transferred in from District of Kentucky Western; Case Number 1:21-cv-00082. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 28, 2021 MEMBER CASE OPENED MDL 2996: Western District of Kentucky, 1:21-cv-0082-GNS, The City of Columbia et al v. McKinsey & Company, Inc. United States, Opened in California Northern District as 3:21-cv-04956-CRB pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 1 cc: JPMDL (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2021)
June 17, 2021 Filing 8 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER No. 1 from ND/CA re: MDL 2996 (KJA)
June 15, 2021 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Proceedings and Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Defendant McKinsey & Company, Inc. United States (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Transfer Order, #2 Exhibit B - Conditional Transfer Order, #3 Proposed Order) (Lockaby, Amanda)
June 4, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The City of Columbia, The Fiscal Court of Russell County Kentucky, The City of Russell Springs, The City of Jamestown. McKinsey & Company, Inc. United States served on 5/27/2021, answer due 6/17/2021. (Johnson, Ronald)
May 25, 2021 Filing 5 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers. (SMJ)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 5/24/2021. This action is TRANSFERRED to the docket of the Bowling Green Division of the Western District of Kentucky for re-allotment to a judge assigned to that division. All future filings related to this action must be filed under the Bowling Green Division case number. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to mail Plaintiffs a docket sheet showing the new case number and assignment once it has been assigned to the Bowling Green Division. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE this action. The Plaintiffs are INSTRUCTED that "[t]he validity of the filing is not affected by the Clerk's improper assignment" of this action to the Louisville Division. cc: Counsel (SMJ)
May 21, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to McKinsey & Company, Inc. United States. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (JWM)
May 21, 2021 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. (JWM)
May 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against McKinsey & Company, Inc. United States, filed by The City of Columbia, The City of Jamestown, The Fiscal Court of Russell County Kentucky, and The City of Russell Springs. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0644-3347686. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (JWM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The City of Columbia et al v. McKinsey & Company, Inc. United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKinsey & Company Inc United States
Represented By: Amanda M. Lockaby
Represented By: Linsey Walker West
Represented By: Kara M. Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKinsey & Company Inc. United States
Represented By: Kara M. Stewart
Represented By: Linsey Walker West
Represented By: Amanda M. Lockaby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The City of Russell Springs
Represented By: Ronald E. Johnson, Jr.
Represented By: Sarah N. Emery
Represented By: Derrick G. Helm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The City of Columbia
Represented By: Ronald E. Johnson, Jr.
Represented By: Sarah N. Emery
Represented By: Derrick G. Helm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Fiscal Court of Russell County Kentucky
Represented By: Ronald E. Johnson, Jr.
Represented By: Sarah N. Emery
Represented By: Derrick G. Helm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The City of Jamestown
Represented By: Ronald E. Johnson, Jr.
Represented By: Sarah N. Emery
Represented By: Derrick G. Helm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?