The Fiscal Court of Calloway County Kentucky et al v. McKinsey & Company, Inc. United States
Plaintiff: The Fiscal Court of Spencer County Kentucky, The City of Murray, The Fiscal Court of Webster County Kentucky, The Fiscal Court of Muhlenberg County Kentucky, The Fiscal Court of Hancock County Kentucky, The Fiscal Court of Daviess County Kentucky, The City of Campbellsville, The Fiscal Court of Hickman County Kentucky, The Fiscal Court of McLean County Kentucky, The Fiscal Court of Calloway County Kentucky, The Fiscal Court of Taylor County Kentucky, The City of Owensboro and The Fiscal Court of Fulton County Kentucky
Defendant: McKinsey & Company Inc United States and McKinsey & Company Inc. United States
Case Number: 3:2021cv04959
Filed: June 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles R Breyer
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2021 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Kentucky Western; Case Number 3:21-cv-00333. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 28, 2021 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Western Kentucky, 3:21-cv-0333, The Fiscal Court of Calloway County Kentucky et al v. McKinsey & Company, Inc. United States, Opened in California Northern District as 21-cv-04959 CRB pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order CTO-1 cc: JPMDL (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2021)
June 17, 2021 Filing 6 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER No. 1 from ND/CA re: MDL 2996 (KJA)
June 15, 2021 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Proceedings and Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Defendant McKinsey & Company, Inc. United States (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Transfer Order, #2 Exhibit B - Conditional Transfer Order, #3 Proposed Order) (Lockaby, Amanda)
June 4, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Fiscal Court of McLean County Kentucky, The City of Murray, The Fiscal Court of Hickman County Kentucky, The Fiscal Court of Daviess County Kentucky, The Fiscal Court of Spencer County Kentucky, The Fiscal Court of Hancock County Kentucky, The Fiscal Court of Calloway County Kentucky, The Fiscal Court of Webster County Kentucky, The Fiscal Court of Taylor County Kentucky, The City of Owensboro, The Fiscal Court of Fulton County Kentucky, The Fiscal Court of Muhlenberg County Kentucky, The City of Campbellsville. McKinsey & Company, Inc. United States served on 6/1/2021, answer due 6/22/2021. (Johnson, Ronald)
May 24, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to McKinsey & Company, Inc. United States. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (MNM)
May 24, 2021 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge David J. Hale. (MNM)
May 24, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against McKinsey & Company, Inc. United States, filing fee $402, receipt number 0644-3349029, filed by The Fiscal Court of McLean County Kentucky, The City of Murray, The Fiscal Court of Hickman County Kentucky, The Fiscal Court of Daviess County Kentucky, The Fiscal Court of Spencer County Kentucky, The Fiscal Court of Hancock County Kentucky, The Fiscal Court of Calloway County Kentucky, The Fiscal Court of Webster County Kentucky, The Fiscal Court of Taylor County Kentucky, The City of Owensboro, The Fiscal Court of Fulton County Kentucky, The Fiscal Court of Muhlenberg County Kentucky, and The City of Campbellsville. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Tendered) (MNM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Fiscal Court of Calloway County Kentucky et al v. McKinsey & Company, Inc. United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Fiscal Court of Spencer County Kentucky
Represented By: Christopher L. Rhoads
Represented By: Ronald E. Johnson, Jr.
Represented By: Sarah N. Emery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The City of Murray
Represented By: Christopher L. Rhoads
Represented By: Ronald E. Johnson, Jr.
Represented By: Sarah N. Emery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Fiscal Court of Webster County Kentucky
Represented By: Christopher L. Rhoads
Represented By: Ronald E. Johnson, Jr.
Represented By: Sarah N. Emery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Fiscal Court of Muhlenberg County Kentucky
Represented By: Christopher L. Rhoads
Represented By: Ronald E. Johnson, Jr.
Represented By: Sarah N. Emery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Fiscal Court of Hancock County Kentucky
Represented By: Christopher L. Rhoads
Represented By: Ronald E. Johnson, Jr.
Represented By: Sarah N. Emery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Fiscal Court of Daviess County Kentucky
Represented By: Christopher L. Rhoads
Represented By: Ronald E. Johnson, Jr.
Represented By: Sarah N. Emery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The City of Campbellsville
Represented By: Christopher L. Rhoads
Represented By: Ronald E. Johnson, Jr.
Represented By: Sarah N. Emery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Fiscal Court of Hickman County Kentucky
Represented By: Christopher L. Rhoads
Represented By: Ronald E. Johnson, Jr.
Represented By: Sarah N. Emery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Fiscal Court of McLean County Kentucky
Represented By: Christopher L. Rhoads
Represented By: Ronald E. Johnson, Jr.
Represented By: Sarah N. Emery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Fiscal Court of Calloway County Kentucky
Represented By: Christopher L. Rhoads
Represented By: Ronald E. Johnson, Jr.
Represented By: Sarah N. Emery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Fiscal Court of Taylor County Kentucky
Represented By: Christopher L. Rhoads
Represented By: Ronald E. Johnson, Jr.
Represented By: Sarah N. Emery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The City of Owensboro
Represented By: Christopher L. Rhoads
Represented By: Ronald E. Johnson, Jr.
Represented By: Sarah N. Emery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Fiscal Court of Fulton County Kentucky
Represented By: Christopher L. Rhoads
Represented By: Ronald E. Johnson, Jr.
Represented By: Sarah N. Emery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKinsey & Company Inc United States
Represented By: Amanda M. Lockaby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKinsey & Company Inc. United States
Represented By: Amanda M. Lockaby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?