The Board of Education of Mason County, West Virginia et al v. McKinsey & Company, Inc., United States
Plaintiff: The Board of Education of Marion County, West Virginia, The Board of Education of Mason County, West Virginia and The Board of Education of Wyoming County, West Virginia
Defendant: McKinsey & Company Inc United States and McKinsey & Company Inc. United States
Case Number: 3:2021cv04970
Filed: June 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles R Breyer
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2021 Filing 11 Case transferred in from District of West Virginia Southern; Case Number 3:21-cv-00280. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 28, 2021 MEMBER CASE OPENED MDL 2996: Southern District of West Virginia, 3:21-cv-00280, The Board of Education of Mason County, West Virginia et al v. McKinsey & Company, Inc., United States, Opened in California Northern District as 3:21-cv-04970-CRB pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 1 cc: JPMDL (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2021)
June 17, 2021 Filing 10 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1) JUDICIAL PANEL ON MDL: certified copy from the Northern District of California transferring this action to the USDC/NDCA for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407. Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel on 6/16/2021. (cc: attys) (kew)
June 16, 2021 Filing 9 NOTIFICATION FROM JUDICIAL PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION re: Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-1), MDL 2996. (kew)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting Defendant's #7 MOTION for Stay of Proceedings and Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint; staying this action in its entirety, pending resolution of Defendant's 1407 Motion with respect to this action by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (JPML); further extending the time within which McKinsey must respond to the Complaint to 30 days after the JPML rules on McKinsey's 1407 Motion; a response is only required if the JPML denies McKinsey's 1407 Motion with respect to this action, or if the JPML grants McKinsey's 1407 Motion with respect to this action and such a response is required by the transferee court. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 5/27/2021. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)
May 26, 2021 Filing 7 UNOPPOSED MOTION by McKinsey & Company, Inc., United States for Stay of Proceedings and Extension of Time to Respond to the #1 Complaint. (George, Keith)
May 18, 2021 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant McKinsey & Company, Inc., United States. (George, Keith)
May 18, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by John C. Palmer IV, Keith J. George and David S. Russo on behalf of McKinsey & Company, Inc., United States. (George, Keith)
May 17, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY INFORMATION by James F. Humphreys updating name and/or firm information on behalf of The Board of Education of Marion County, West Virginia, The Board of Education of Mason County, West Virginia, The Board of Education of Wyoming County, West Virginia. (Humphreys, James)
May 14, 2021 Filing 4 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY of John Wayne Hogan on behalf of The Board of Education of Wyoming County, West Virginia, The Board of Education of Marion County, West Virginia, The Board of Education of Mason County, West Virginia. Local counsel: James F. Humphreys. Fee $50.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7945615. (mkw)
May 5, 2021 CASE assigned to Judge Robert C. Chambers. (klc)
May 5, 2021 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Eifert. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (hkl)
May 5, 2021 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7938552. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (hkl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Board of Education of Mason County, West Virginia et al v. McKinsey & Company, Inc., United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Board of Education of Marion County, West Virginia
Represented By: John Wayne Hogan
Represented By: James F. Humphreys
Represented By: James F. Humphreys,
Represented By: John Wayne Hogan,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Board of Education of Mason County, West Virginia
Represented By: John Wayne Hogan
Represented By: James F. Humphreys
Represented By: James F. Humphreys,
Represented By: John Wayne Hogan,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Board of Education of Wyoming County, West Virginia
Represented By: John Wayne Hogan
Represented By: James F. Humphreys
Represented By: James F. Humphreys,
Represented By: John Wayne Hogan,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKinsey & Company Inc United States
Represented By: John C. Palmer, IV
Represented By: Keith J. George
Represented By: David S. Russo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKinsey & Company Inc. United States
Represented By: David S. Russo
Represented By: John C. Palmer, IV
Represented By: Keith J. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?