Edwards v. Jaguar Land Rover North America LLC
Plaintiff: Linda Edwards
Defendant: Jaguar Land Rover North America LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv05061
Filed: June 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles R Breyer
Referring Judge: Susan van Keulen
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1330 Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2022 Filing 36 NOTICE of Disassociation of Counsel for Plaintiff by Linda Edwards (Dolin, Tionna) (Filed on 6/22/2022) Modified on 6/23/2022 (jml, COURT STAFF).
March 23, 2022 Filing 35 CLERK'S NOTICE Remanding Case to Contra Costa County Superior Court. (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2022)
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #19 Motion to Remand. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2022)
March 17, 2022 Filing 33 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING MOTION TO REMAND hearing set for March 17, 2022 before the Honorable Charles R. Breyer. The motion will be determined on the briefs. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2022)
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: The case management conference set for February 25, 2022 is vacated. Case Management Conference set for 7/15/2022 at 8:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor. A Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/8/2022. Close of Fact Discovery due by 9/30/2022. Close of Expert Discovery due by 1/9/2023. Motions due by 2/13/2023. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/17/2022. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2022)
February 16, 2022 Filing 31 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Linda Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Plaintiff Linda C. Francois Edwards's Request for Remote Appearance at the Case Management Conference on February 23, 2022)(Kuemerle, Karin) (Filed on 2/16/2022)
February 16, 2022 Filing 30 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Jaguar Land Rover North America LLC and Linda Edwards. (Ramia, Sean) (Filed on 2/16/2022) Modified on 2/17/2022 (jml, COURT STAFF).
January 29, 2022 Filing 29 NOTICE of Change of Address by Tionna Grace Dolin (Dolin, Tionna) (Filed on 1/29/2022)
January 7, 2022 Filing 28 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING MOTION TO REMAND HEARING. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.). Motion Hearing set for 3/17/2022 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only before Judge Charles R. Breyer. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/crb Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at crbcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than March 15, 2022 at 3:30 PM PST.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Motion Hearing set for 3/17/2022 10:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Charles R. Breyer. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2022)
January 7, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #19 MOTION to Remand. Motion Hearing set for 3/17/2022 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only before Judge Charles R. Breyer. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2022)
January 6, 2022 Filing 27 Case Reassigned to Judge Charles R. Breyer. Caseload Rebalancing Judge no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2022)
January 6, 2022 Filing 26 This case will be randomly assigned/reassigned to a District Judge outside the San Jose Division pursuant to the Caseload Rebalancing Pilot Program approved by the Court effective March 1, 2018. For information, visit our web page at #http://cand.uscourts.gov/news/225. (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2022)
January 5, 2022 Filing 25 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Linda Edwards.. (Kuemerle, Karin) (Filed on 1/5/2022)
December 27, 2021 Filing 24 REPLY (re #19 MOTION to Remand ) filed byLinda Edwards. (Kuemerle, Karin) (Filed on 12/27/2021)
December 17, 2021 Filing 23 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #19 MOTION to Remand ) filed byJaguar Land Rover North America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration DECLARATION OF PARRIS H. SCHMIDT IN SUPPORT OF JAGUAR LAND ROVER NORTH AMERICA, LLC 'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND)(Ramia, Sean) (Filed on 12/17/2021)
December 17, 2021 Filing 22 You are receiving this Notice because this case has been assigned to the Honorable Lucy H. Koh. On December 13, 2021, Judge Koh was confirmed to the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit. The parties to this action are instructed to meet and confer to determine if collectively they will consent to transfer of this case to a Magistrate Judge for all purposes. On or before January 5, 2022, each party must file either (1) written consent to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge or (2) a request for reassignment of this case to a district judge. The parties may consent to the jurisdiction of a specific Magistrate Judge regardless of the division of the Court to which that Judge is assigned. In the event that the parties decline consent to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction, the case will be randomly reassigned to a district judge who likely will not be resident in the San Jose division of the Court. ON BEHALF OF THE EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE, Richard Seeborg, Chief Judge. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ecg-adi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2021)
December 3, 2021 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101] The supporting documents should be attached to the motion. In the future please file supporting documents as attachments to the motion. No further action is necessary. Re: #20 Pretrial Memorandum filed by Linda Edwards (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2021)
December 3, 2021 Filing 21 Request for Judicial Notice re #19 MOTION to Remand filed byLinda Edwards. (Related document(s) #19 ) (Kuemerle, Karin) (Filed on 12/3/2021)
December 3, 2021 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Remand by Linda Edwards. (Kuemerle, Karin) (Filed on 12/3/2021) Modified on 12/6/2021 (jml, COURT STAFF).
December 3, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION to Remand filed by Linda Edwards. Motion Hearing set for 3/17/2022 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 12/17/2021. Replies due by 12/27/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Remand)(Kuemerle, Karin) (Filed on 12/3/2021)
December 3, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Karin Kuemerle (Kuemerle, Karin) (Filed on 12/3/2021)
October 29, 2021 ***Set/Reset Hearings per #17 Case Management Order:Further Case Management Conference set for February 23, 2022 at 2:00 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Hearing on Dispositive Motions set for April 6, 2023 at 1:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Final Pretrial Conference set for June 1, 2023 at 1:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Jury Trial (5 days) set for June 19, 2023 at 9:00 AM each day in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor before Judge Lucy H. Koh. (ked, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2021)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Case Management Order. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 10/28/2021. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2021)
October 28, 2021 Filing 16 REQUEST for ADR Phone Conference re 14 Clerk's Notice,, (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Request to Appear at Initial Status Conference by Telephone)(Dolin, Tionna) (Filed on 10/28/2021)
October 27, 2021 Filing 15 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Jaguar Land Rover North America LLC and Linda C. Francois Edwards. (Ramia, Sean) (Filed on 10/27/2021) Modified on 10/28/2021 (jml, COURT STAFF).
October 4, 2021 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE FOLLOWING CASE REASSIGNMENT TO THE HONORABLE LUCY H. KOH. Following the case reassignment to the Honorable Lucy H. Koh, an Initial Case Management Conference is set for November 3, 2021 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th floor, in San Jose, California. The Joint Case Management Statement is due seven days prior to the Initial Case Management Conference. See Civil L.R. 16-9 and Civil L.R. 16-10(a). The parties shall familiarize themselves with the Scheduling Notes and Standing Orders for the Hon. Lucy H. Koh: http://cand.uscourts.gov/lhk. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2021)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Lucy H. Koh for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen remains as referral judge assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 9/27/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2021)
September 23, 2021 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (jhfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2021)
September 23, 2021 Filing 11 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT and Rule 26(f) report and Discovery Plan filed by Jaguar Land Rover North America LLC and Linda C. Francois Edwards. (Schmidt, Parris) (Filed on 9/23/2021) Modified on 9/23/2021 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
August 18, 2021 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING 9/28/21 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO 10/12/21.Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/12/2021 09:30 AM in San Jose, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Case Management Statement due by 10/5/2021. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/svk < /A
July 15, 2021 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Jaguar Land Rover North America LLC.. (Schmidt, Parris) (Filed on 7/15/2021)
July 9, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byJaguar Land Rover North America LLC. (Ramia, Sean) (Filed on 7/9/2021)
July 1, 2021 Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/21/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/28/2021 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2021)
July 1, 2021 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jaguar Land Rover North America LLC re #1 Notice of Removal and Judge's Standing Orders (Schmidt, Parris) (Filed on 7/1/2021)
July 1, 2021 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/15/2021. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2021)
July 1, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Sogoyan (Sogoyan, Gregory) (Filed on 7/1/2021)
July 1, 2021 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet by Jaguar Land Rover North America LLC . (Schmidt, Parris) (Filed on 7/1/2021)
July 1, 2021 #Electronic filing error. No Civil cover sheet filed. Please refer to Civil Local Rules 3-2(a) re civil cover sheet requirement. This filing will not be processed by the clerks off ice until the civil cover sheet is filed Re: #1 Notice of Removal filed by Jaguar Land Rover North America LLC (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2021)
June 30, 2021 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Jaguar Land Rover North America LLC identifying Corporate Parent Jaguar Land Rover Limited for Jaguar Land Rover North America LLC. (Schmidt, Parris) (Filed on 6/30/2021)
June 30, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Contra Costa County Superior Court. Their case number is C21-01034. (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0971-16130819). Filed byJaguar Land Rover North America LLC. (Schmidt, Parris) (Filed on 6/30/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edwards v. Jaguar Land Rover North America LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaguar Land Rover North America LLC
Represented By: Parris Hugh Schmidt
Represented By: Brian Takahashi
Represented By: Sean Anthony Ramia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Edwards
Represented By: Tionna Grace Dolin
Represented By: Karin Kuemerle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?