The County of Albany, New York v. McKinsey & Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: The County of Albany, New York
Defendant: McKinsey & Company Inc and McKinsey & Company Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv05184
Filed: July 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles R Breyer
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2021 Filing 10 Case transferred in from District of New York Northern; Case Number 1:21-cv-00630. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 6, 2021 MEMBER CASE OPENED MDL 2996: Northern District of New York - Main Office (Syracuse), 1:21-cv-00630-MAD-CFH, The County of Albany, New York v. McKinsey & Company, Inc., Opened in California Northern District as 3:21-cv-05184-CRB pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 3 cc: JPMDL (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2021)
June 29, 2021 Filing 9 JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order #2. Opposition period has expired with no objections filed. ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Northern District of California for inclusion into MDL-2996 National Prescription Opiate Consultant Litigation. Case to be assigned to the Hon. Charles R. Breyer, U.S. District Judge. (plp)
June 16, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE by The County of Albany, New York re #6 Notice of Admission Requirement, #5 Notice of Admission Requirement, #4 Notice of Admission Requirement, (Migliori, Donald)
June 2, 2021 Filing 7 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE REGARDING JUDGE D'AGOSTINO CASE DISPOSITION PILOT - Please refer to the Individual Rules and Practices of the Hon. Mae A. D'Agostino, U.S. District Judge, for guidance regarding the Case Disposition Pilot. https://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/sites/nynd/files/MAD_Rules_of_Practice_04_14_2020.pdf. (jmb)
June 2, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT: as to Party Plaintiff; Attorney Linda Singer, Esq., Email address is lsinger@motleyrice.com. Phone number is (202) 232-5504. Admissions due by 6/16/2021. {Copy sent to Attorney Singer by email along with a courtesy copy of General Order 25} (jmb)
June 2, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT: as to Party Plaintiff; Attorney Lisa M. Saltzburg, Esq., Email address is lsaltzburg@motleyrice.com. Phone number is (843) 216-9000. Admissions due by 6/16/2021. {Copy sent to Attorney Saltzburg by email along with a courtesy copy of General Order 25} (jmb)
June 2, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT: as to Party Plaintiff; Attorney Joseph F. Rice, Esq., Email address is jrice@motleyrice.com. Phone number is (843) 216-9000. Admissions due by 6/16/2021. {Copy sent to Attorney Rice by email along with a courtesy copy of General Order 25} (jmb)
June 2, 2021 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Rule 16 Conference set for 8/31/2021 at 9:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 8/24/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (jmb)
June 2, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to McKinsey & Company, Inc. (jmb)
May 31, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND: against McKinsey & Company, Inc. (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-5540122) filed by The County of Albany, New York. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jmb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The County of Albany, New York v. McKinsey & Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The County of Albany, New York
Represented By: Donald A. Migliori
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKinsey & Company Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKinsey & Company Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?