Whigham et al v. McKinsey & Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: Anita Whigham
Defendant: McKinsey & Company Inc and McKinsey & Company Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv05185
Filed: July 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles R Breyer
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2021 Filing 12 Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:21-cv-05328. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 6, 2021 Filing 11 CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - Northern District of California. (Signed by MDL Panel on 7/6/2021) (sjo)
July 6, 2021 MDL TRANSFER OUT ELECTRONICALLY: to the United States District Court - Northern District of California. (sjo)
July 6, 2021 MEMBER CASE OPENED MDL 2996: Southern District of New York, 1:21-cv-05328-VSB, Whigham v. McKinsey & Company, Inc., Opened in California Northern District as 3:21-cv-05185-CRB pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 4 cc: JPMDL (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2021)
June 30, 2021 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. McKinsey & Company, Inc. served on 6/28/2021, answer due 7/19/2021. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Anita Whigham(individually); Anita Whigham(and on behalf of her minor son, J.C.). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit USPS Proof of Delivery).(Bickford, Scott)
June 24, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #8 MOTION for Celeste Brustowicz to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number CNYSDC-24711380. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #9 Declaration in Support of Motion. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from California Supreme Court; Louisiana Supreme Court; Mississippi Supreme Court; The motion to appear PHV and all supporting documents need to be filed under 1 docket entry. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. (aea)
June 23, 2021 Filing 9 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - DECLARATION of Celeste Brustowicz in Support re: #8 MOTION for Celeste Brustowicz to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number CNYSDC-24711380. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. Document filed by Anita Whigham(individually). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing).(Brustowicz, Celeste) Modified on 6/24/2021 (aea).
June 23, 2021 Filing 8 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Celeste Brustowicz to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number CNYSDC-24711380. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Anita Whigham(individually). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order).(Brustowicz, Celeste) Modified on 6/24/2021 (aea).
June 23, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #7 MOTION for Scott R. Bickford to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24704291. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
June 22, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Scott R. Bickford to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24704291. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Anita Whigham(individually), Anita Whigham(and on behalf of her minor son, J.C.). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit LA Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit TX Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit CO Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Affidavit, #5 Text of Proposed Order).(Bickford, Scott)
June 21, 2021 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to McKinsey & Company, Inc.. (vf)
June 17, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to McKinsey & Company, Inc., re: #4 Complaint. Document filed by Anita Whigham(individually), Anita Whigham(and on behalf of her minor son, J.C.)..(Creadore, Donald)
June 17, 2021 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against McKinsey & Company, Inc.. Document filed by Anita Whigham(individually), Anita Whigham(and on behalf of her minor son, J.C.)..(Creadore, Donald)
June 17, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Donald E. Creadore. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: ANITA WHIGHAM. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party role was entered incorrectly; party text was omitted;. (jgo)
June 17, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Donald E. Creadore. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Citizenship Defendant code 1 (Citizen of This State); Dollar Demand $10,000,000,000. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Citizenship Defendant code has been modified to 4 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-This State); the Dollar Demand has been modified to none. (jgo)
June 17, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Donald E. Creadore to RE-FILE re: Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; add parties Anita Whigham with party text 'on behalf of her minor son, J.C.', and, McKinsey & Company, Inc.; the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents.. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo)
June 17, 2021 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
June 17, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
June 17, 2021 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Anita Whigham, Anita Whigham, McKinsey & Company, Inc. added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,.Document filed by Anita Whigham, Anita Whigham, McKinsey & Company, Inc.. Related document: #1 Complaint,..(Creadore, Donald)
June 17, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Donald E. Creadore to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): party name must be added in order for a summons to be issued;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
June 17, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
June 16, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Creadore, Donald)
June 16, 2021 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST PARTY ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MCKINSEY & COMPANY, INC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by ANITA WHIGHAM..(Creadore, Donald) Modified on 6/17/2021 (jgo).
June 16, 2021 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - COMPLAINT against ANITA WHIGHAM. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24683538)Document filed by ANITA WHIGHAM..(Creadore, Donald) Modified on 6/17/2021 (jgo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whigham et al v. McKinsey & Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anita Whigham
Represented By: Celeste Brustowicz
Represented By: Scott R. Bickford
Represented By: Donald E. Creadore
Represented By: Celeste L Brustowicz
Represented By: Donald E. Creadore,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKinsey & Company Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKinsey & Company Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?