ORANGE COUNTY, INDIANA v. MCKINSEY & COMPANY, INC. et al.
Plaintiff: ORANGE COUNTY, INDIANA
Defendant: McKinsey & Company Inc, McKinsey & Company Inc United States, McKinsey & Company Inc Washington DC, McKinsey & Company Inc., McKinsey & Company Inc. United States and McKinsey & Company Inc. Washington D.C.
Case Number: 3:2021cv05344
Filed: July 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles R Breyer
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2021 Filing 28 Case transferred in from District of Indiana Southern; Case Number 4:21-cv-00043. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 13, 2021 Filing 27 Transfer Letter to Clerk of the Northern District of California. Case transferred electronically to Northern District of California, IN RE: MDL 2996 on July 6, 2021. (MAC)
July 13, 2021 MEMBER CASE OPENED MDL 2996: Southern District of Indiana (New Albany), 4:21-cv-00043-TWP-DML, ORANGE COUNTY, INDIANA v. MCKINSEY & COMPANY, INC. et al., Opened in California Northern District as 3:21-cv-05344-CRB pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 1 cc: JPMDL (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2021)
July 6, 2021 Filing 26 CLOSED TRANSFER to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California IN RE: MCKINSEY & COMPANY, INC., NATIONAL PRESCRIPTION OPIATE CONSULTANT LITIGATION MDL No. 2996 per CTO-1. (MAC)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #23 Motion to Substitute Attorney. The appearance of Jessica Whelan is hereby substituted for Devra Hake as to defedants MCKINSEY & COMPANY, INC., MCKINSEY & COMPANY, INC. and MCKINSEY & COMPANY, INC. WASHINGTON D.C.. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 5/20/2021. (TMC)
May 19, 2021 Filing 24 Submission of Proposed Order , re #23 MOTION to Substitute Attorney Jessica E. Whelan as Counsel for Defendants and to Withdraw Devra T. Hake, filed by Defendants MCKINSEY & COMPANY, INC., MCKINSEY & COMPANY, INC. UNITED STATES, MCKINSEY & COMPANY, INC. WASHINGTON D.C.. (Hake, Devra)
May 18, 2021 Filing 23 MOTION to Substitute Attorney Jessica E. Whelan as Counsel for Defendants and to Withdraw Devra T. Hake, filed by Defendants MCKINSEY & COMPANY, INC., MCKINSEY & COMPANY, INC. UNITED STATES, MCKINSEY & COMPANY, INC. WASHINGTON D.C.. (Hake, Devra)
April 23, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE of Filing with the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation of Motion to Transfer for Coordinated or Consolidated Pretrial Proceedings Pursuant to U.S.C. 1407 by All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Motion to Transfer, #2 Exhibit Notice of Related Action) (Hake, Devra)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #19 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Proceedings and Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. All proceedings in this Action, with the exception of Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Interim Class Counsel, are stayed pending resolution of Defendants' Motion to Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407, filed with the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on March 5, 2021. The time within which McKinsey must respond to the Complaint is extended to and including 30 days after the JPML rules on McKinsey's 1407 Motion, and that a response is only required if: (a) the JPML denies McKinsey's 1407 Motion; or (b) if the JPML grants McKinsey's 1407 Motion and such a response is required by the transferee court (See Order). Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 4/21/2021. (TMC)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appoint Interim Class Counsel. The Court hereby designates Michael D. Grabhorn and Andrew M. Grabhorn of Grabhorn Law | Insured Rights, William D. Nefzger of Bahe Cook Cantley & Nefzger, PLC, and Kenneth C. Pierce, II of Blanton & Pierce, LLC, as Interim Class Counsel (See Order). Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 4/20/2021. (TMC)
April 19, 2021 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Proceedings and Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint, filed by Defendants MCKINSEY & COMPANY, INC., MCKINSEY & COMPANY, INC. UNITED STATES, MCKINSEY & COMPANY, INC. WASHINGTON D.C.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hake, Devra)
April 19, 2021 Filing 18 Submission of Proposed Order Unopposed Order to Appoint Interim Class Counsel, re #10 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Interim Class Counsel, filed by Plaintiff ORANGE COUNTY, INDIANA. (Grabhorn, Michael)
April 19, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information. Consistent with Local Rule 5-3, Devra Hake hereby notifies the Clerk of the court of changed contact information. (Hake, Devra)
April 16, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Devra Hake on behalf of Defendants MCKINSEY & COMPANY, INC., MCKINSEY & COMPANY, INC. UNITED STATES, MCKINSEY & COMPANY, INC. WASHINGTON D.C.. (Hake, Devra)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER STRIKING FILINGS - This matter is before the Court on two documents filed April 15, 2021 at Dkt. #13 and Dkt. #14 , which regrettably must be STRICKEN, as they are procedurally improper (See Order). Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 4/16/2021.(TMC)
April 15, 2021 Filing 14 ***STRICKEN PER #15 ***Submission Agreed Order Extending Time to Respond and to Stay, filed by Plaintiff ORANGE COUNTY, INDIANA. (Grabhorn, Michael) Modified on 4/16/2021 to edit document title (TMC).
April 15, 2021 Filing 13 ***STRICKEN PER #15 ***Submission of Proposed Order Unopposed, re #10 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Interim Class Counsel, filed by Plaintiff ORANGE COUNTY, INDIANA. (Grabhorn, Michael) Modified on 4/16/2021 to edit document title (TMC).
April 15, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by William D. Nefzger on behalf of Plaintiff ORANGE COUNTY, INDIANA. (Nefzger, William)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. William D. Nefzger is granted leave to appear pro hac vice on behalf of plaintiffs in this matter. The court FURTHER ORDERS that William D. Nefzger register as users of the court's electronic case filing system by April 26, 2021. Failure to register could result in the revocation of his admission pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 4/12/2021 (Copy mailed per distribution list). (TMC)
April 10, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Interim Class Counsel, filed by Plaintiff ORANGE COUNTY, INDIANA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Grabhorn, Michael)
April 10, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Attorney(s) William D. Nefzger to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-6505521), filed by Plaintiff ORANGE COUNTY, INDIANA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Grabhorn, Michael)
April 8, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth C. Pierce, II on behalf of Plaintiff ORANGE COUNTY, INDIANA. (Pierce, Kenneth)
April 8, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth C. Pierce, II on behalf of Plaintiff ORANGE COUNTY, INDIANA. (Pierce, Kenneth)
April 6, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth C. Pierce, II on behalf of Plaintiff ORANGE COUNTY, INDIANA. (Pierce, Kenneth)
March 30, 2021 Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (TMC)
March 30, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued by Clerk as to MCKINSEY & COMPANY, INC., MCKINSEY & COMPANY, INC. UNITED STATES, MCKINSEY & COMPANY, INC. WASHINGTON D.C. (TMC)
March 29, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew M. Grabhorn on behalf of Plaintiff ORANGE COUNTY. (Grabhorn, Andrew)
March 29, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael D. Grabhorn on behalf of Plaintiff ORANGE COUNTY. (Grabhorn, Michael)
March 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against McKinsey and Company, Inc., McKinsey and Company, Inc. U.S., McKinsey and Company, Inc. Washington D.C., filed by ORANGE COUNTY. (Filing fee $402, receipt number 0756-6483479) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons)(Grabhorn, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ORANGE COUNTY, INDIANA v. MCKINSEY & COMPANY, INC. et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ORANGE COUNTY, INDIANA
Represented By: Andrew M. Grabhorn
Represented By: Kenneth C. Pierce, II
Represented By: Michael D. Grabhorn
Represented By: William D. Nefzger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKinsey & Company Inc
Represented By: Devra Hake
Represented By: Jessica Whelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKinsey & Company Inc United States
Represented By: Devra Hake
Represented By: Jessica Whelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKinsey & Company Inc Washington DC
Represented By: Devra Hake
Represented By: Jessica Whelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKinsey & Company Inc.
Represented By: Devra Hake
Represented By: Jessica Whelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKinsey & Company Inc. United States
Represented By: Devra Hake
Represented By: Jessica Whelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKinsey & Company Inc. Washington D.C.
Represented By: Jessica Whelan
Represented By: Devra Hake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?