Petretta v. Silbermann et al
Plaintiff: Howard Petretta
Defendant: Benjamin Silbermann, Evan Sharp, Todd Morgenfeld, Andrea Wishom, Jeremy S. Levine, Jeffrey Jordan, Fredric G. Reynolds, Leslie J. Kilgore, Gokul Rajaram, Michelle Wilson and Pinterest, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv05385
Filed: July 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Referring Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2021 Filing 27 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Howard Petretta. Service waived by Andrea Wishom waiver sent on 7/30/2021, answer due 9/28/2021. (Del Gaizo, Gregory) (Filed on 8/16/2021)
August 16, 2021 Filing 26 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Howard Petretta. Service waived by Michelle Wilson waiver sent on 7/30/2021, answer due 9/28/2021. (Del Gaizo, Gregory) (Filed on 8/16/2021)
August 16, 2021 Filing 25 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Howard Petretta. Service waived by Benjamin Silbermann waiver sent on 7/30/2021, answer due 9/28/2021. (Del Gaizo, Gregory) (Filed on 8/16/2021)
August 16, 2021 Filing 24 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Howard Petretta. Service waived by Evan Sharp waiver sent on 7/30/2021, answer due 9/28/2021. (Del Gaizo, Gregory) (Filed on 8/16/2021)
August 16, 2021 Filing 23 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Howard Petretta. Service waived by Fredric G. Reynolds waiver sent on 7/30/2021, answer due 9/28/2021. (Del Gaizo, Gregory) (Filed on 8/16/2021)
August 16, 2021 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Howard Petretta. Service waived by Gokul Rajaram waiver sent on 7/30/2021, answer due 9/28/2021. (Del Gaizo, Gregory) (Filed on 8/16/2021)
August 16, 2021 Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Howard Petretta. Service waived by Todd Morgenfeld waiver sent on 7/30/2021, answer due 9/28/2021. (Del Gaizo, Gregory) (Filed on 8/16/2021)
August 16, 2021 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Howard Petretta. Service waived by Jeremy S. Levine waiver sent on 7/30/2021, answer due 9/28/2021. (Del Gaizo, Gregory) (Filed on 8/16/2021)
August 16, 2021 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Howard Petretta. Service waived by Leslie J. Kilgore waiver sent on 7/30/2021, answer due 9/28/2021. (Del Gaizo, Gregory) (Filed on 8/16/2021)
August 16, 2021 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Howard Petretta. Service waived by Pinterest, Inc. waiver sent on 7/30/2021, answer due 9/28/2021. (Del Gaizo, Gregory) (Filed on 8/16/2021)
August 16, 2021 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Howard Petretta. Service waived by Jeffrey Jordan waiver sent on 7/30/2021, answer due 9/28/2021. (Del Gaizo, Gregory) (Filed on 8/16/2021)
July 20, 2021 Filing 16 Case reassigned to Judge William Alsup. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2021)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER RELATING CASE No. 21-cv-05385 to No. 20-cv-08331. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 7/20/2021. (amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2021)
July 19, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Drew Liming (Liming, Drew) (Filed on 7/19/2021)
July 19, 2021 Filing 13 Declaration of Doru Gavril in Support of #5 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byPinterest, Inc.. (Related document(s) #5 ) (Gavril, Doru) (Filed on 7/19/2021)
July 19, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Doru Gavril (Gavril, Doru) (Filed on 7/19/2021)
July 19, 2021 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pinterest, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Lloyd's of London, Other Affiliate Houston Casualty Company, Other Affiliate Blackrock, Inc., Other Affiliate The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc., Other Affiliate AIG, Other Affiliate Allianz Global Risks Us Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Hudson Insurance Company, Other Affiliate RSUI Indemnity Company, Other Affiliate Old Republic Insurance Company, Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group, Inc., Other Affiliate Axis Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Nationwide, Other Affiliate Beazley Insurance Company, Inc., Other Affiliate Arch Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Paul Sciarra, Other Affiliate Allied World Assurance Company (US), Other Affiliate Sompo International, Other Affiliate Everest National Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Berkley Insurance Company, Other Affiliate XL Specialty Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Markel American Insurance Company for Pinterest, Inc.. (Feldman, Boris) (Filed on 7/19/2021)
July 19, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Boris Feldman (Feldman, Boris) (Filed on 7/19/2021)
July 15, 2021 Filing 9 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/11/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/18/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2021)
July 15, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Jeffrey Jordan, Leslie J. Kilgore, Jeremy S. Levine, Todd Morgenfeld, Pinterest, Inc., Gokul Rajaram, Fredric G. Reynolds, Evan Sharp, Benjamin Silbermann, Michelle Wilson, Andrea Wishom. (arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2021)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF SUA SPONTE REFERRAL for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 20-cv-08331-WHA. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 7/15/2021. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2021)
July 14, 2021 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Howard Petretta re #5 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Del Gaizo, Gregory) (Filed on 7/14/2021)
July 14, 2021 Filing 5 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Howard Petretta. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Complaint; Ex. A to Declaration, #4 Unredacted Version of Complaint; Ex B to Declaration)(Robbins, Brian) (Filed on 7/14/2021)
July 14, 2021 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/28/2021. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2021)
July 14, 2021 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Howard Petretta (Robbins, Brian) (Filed on 7/14/2021)
July 14, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Robbins, Brian) (Filed on 7/14/2021)
July 14, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jeffrey Jordan, Leslie J. Kilgore, Jeremy S. Levine, Todd Morgenfeld, Pinterest, Inc., Gokul Rajaram, Fredric G. Reynolds, Evan Sharp, Benjamin Silbermann, Michelle Wilson, Andrea Wishom ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-16174880.). Filed byHoward Petretta. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Robbins, Brian) (Filed on 7/14/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Petretta v. Silbermann et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard Petretta
Represented By: Gregory Eric Del Gaizo
Represented By: Brian J. Robbins
Represented By: Matias Montillano
Represented By: Shane Palmesano Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin Silbermann
Represented By: Boris Feldman
Represented By: Doru Gavril
Represented By: Drew Liming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evan Sharp
Represented By: Boris Feldman
Represented By: Doru Gavril
Represented By: Drew Liming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Morgenfeld
Represented By: Boris Feldman
Represented By: Doru Gavril
Represented By: Drew Liming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrea Wishom
Represented By: Boris Feldman
Represented By: Doru Gavril
Represented By: Drew Liming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy S. Levine
Represented By: Boris Feldman
Represented By: Doru Gavril
Represented By: Drew Liming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Jordan
Represented By: Boris Feldman
Represented By: Doru Gavril
Represented By: Drew Liming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fredric G. Reynolds
Represented By: Boris Feldman
Represented By: Doru Gavril
Represented By: Drew Liming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie J. Kilgore
Represented By: Boris Feldman
Represented By: Doru Gavril
Represented By: Drew Liming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gokul Rajaram
Represented By: Boris Feldman
Represented By: Doru Gavril
Represented By: Drew Liming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Wilson
Represented By: Boris Feldman
Represented By: Doru Gavril
Represented By: Drew Liming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pinterest, Inc.
Represented By: Boris Feldman
Represented By: Doru Gavril
Represented By: Drew Liming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?