San Francisco Baykeeper v. Global Plating, Inc.
Plaintiff: San Francisco Baykeeper
Defendant: Global Plating, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv05412
Filed: July 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33 U.S.C. ยง 1365
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2021 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 9/21/2021. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 9/21/2021. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2021)
September 3, 2021 Filing 11 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Answer Complaint filed by Global Plating, Inc. and San Francisco Baykeeper. (Beard, John) (Filed on 9/3/2021) Modified on 9/7/2021 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
September 3, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by John Adam Beard (Beard, John) (Filed on 9/3/2021)
September 3, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by James Robert Arnold (Arnold, James) (Filed on 9/3/2021)
August 16, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by San Francisco Baykeeper (Swanhuyser, Jesse) (Filed on 8/16/2021)
July 22, 2021 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by San Francisco Baykeeper.. (Sasaki, Nicole) (Filed on 7/22/2021)
July 15, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Global Plating, Inc.. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2021)
July 15, 2021 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/11/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/18/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2021)
July 15, 2021 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/29/2021. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2021)
July 14, 2021 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Swanhuyser, Jesse) (Filed on 7/14/2021)
July 14, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by San Francisco Baykeeper . (Swanhuyser, Jesse) (Filed on 7/14/2021)
July 14, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Global Plating, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-16177388.). Filed bySan Francisco Baykeeper. (Swanhuyser, Jesse) (Filed on 7/14/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: San Francisco Baykeeper v. Global Plating, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: San Francisco Baykeeper
Represented By: Jesse Colorado Swanhuyser
Represented By: Daniel Cooper
Represented By: Nicole Chiyeko Sasaki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Plating, Inc.
Represented By: James Robert Arnold
Represented By: John Adam Beard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?