Dowdy v. Nam et al
Plaintiff: Vernon Dowdy
Defendant: Registered Nurse(RN) Nam, Registered Nurse(RN) Frances and RN Patrick Guillien
Case Number: 3:2021cv05609
Filed: July 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: PSLC MWD
Referring Judge: Joseph C Spero
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Vernon Dowdy. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2021)
August 27, 2021 Filing 5 Prisoner Statement of Account. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2021)
August 26, 2021 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Vernon Dowdy.. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2021)
July 22, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
July 22, 2021 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 8/30/2021. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
July 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Frances, Patrick Guillien, Nam (Filing fee IFPP). Filed byVernon Dowdy. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2021)
July 22, 2021 Remark: Case opening documents mailed to Plaintiff. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dowdy v. Nam et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vernon Dowdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Registered Nurse(RN) Nam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Registered Nurse(RN) Frances
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RN Patrick Guillien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?