Pierce v. Monsanto Company et al
Plaintiff: Paul L. Pierce
Defendant: Monsanto Company and JOHN DOES 1-50
Case Number: 3:2021cv05623
Filed: July 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2021 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. [RE: Plaintiff Paul Pierce] (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise) (Filed on 8/23/2021)
August 23, 2021 Filing 6 Certificate of Interested Entities by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. [RE: Plaintiff Paul Pierce] (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise) (Filed on 8/23/2021)
August 23, 2021 Filing 5 Monsanto Company's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand [RE: Plaintiff Paul Pierce] byMonsanto Company. (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise) (Filed on 8/23/2021)
July 23, 2021 Filing 4 Case Transferred in from United States District Court for the Western District of New York (Buffalo); Case Number 1:21-cv-00765-JLS. Original File Certified Copy of Transfer Order and Docket Sheet Received.
July 23, 2021 MEMBER CASE OPENED re MDL 2741: United States District Court for the Western District of New York (Buffalo), 1:21-cv-00765-JLS, Paul L. Pierce v. Monsanto Company, et al, Opened in California Northern District as 3:21-cv-05623-VC pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-277) cc: JPMDL (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2021)
July 9, 2021 Filing 3 MULTIDISTRICT CONDITIONAL LITIGATION TRANSFER ORDER to the Northern District of California. Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel on 7/9/2021. (KM)
July 6, 2021 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Paul L Pierce. Monsanto Company waiver sent on 6/25/2021, answer due 8/24/2021. (Goldstein, Brian)
June 25, 2021 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(TMK)
June 25, 2021 Case Assigned to Hon. John L. Sinatra, Jr. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (TMK)
June 25, 2021 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (TMK)
June 25, 2021 Original Summons Not Submitted (TMK)
June 25, 2021 Notified Multi-District Litigation Panel of potential tag-along case. (TMK)
June 24, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND JURY TRIAL DEMANDED against John Does 1-50, Monsanto Company, $402.00, receipt number 0209-4286085, filed by Paul L Pierce. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Goldstein, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pierce v. Monsanto Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul L. Pierce
Represented By: Brian A. Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Represented By: Jennise Walker-Stubbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?