Shakanasa v. Contreras
Plaintiff: Asar Tauf Shakanasa and Edward T. Furnace
Defendant: C. Contreras
Case Number: 3:2021cv05635
Filed: July 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: PSLC AGB
Referring Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
2 Judge: James Donato
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER RE DISMISSAL WITH LEAVE TO AMEND re #1 Complaint filed by Asar Tauf Shakanasa. Signed by Judge James Donato on 8/31/2021. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2021)
August 16, 2021 Filing 11 Letter from Plaintiff Shakanasa. (arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2021)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge James Donato for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 8/11/21. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(asS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 10, 2021 Filing 9 Receipt for $402 filing fee. (arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2021)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO REASSIGN CASE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 8/10/2021. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 9, 2021 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Asar Tauf Shakanasa. (arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2021)
August 5, 2021 Filing 6 Letter re Case Number from Asar Shakanasa. (arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2021)
July 26, 2021 Filing 5 Remark: mailed #3 and #4 to plaintiff (arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2021)
July 26, 2021 Added plaintiff's a.k.a. to mailing address.(ljf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2021)
July 23, 2021 Filing 4 Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge (arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
July 23, 2021 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 8/30/2021. (arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
July 23, 2021 Filing 2 Received Certificate of Prisoner Funds Document by Asar Tauf Shakanasa. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Prisoner Funds, #2 Envelope)(arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2021)
July 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against C. Contreras (Filing fee Due $ 402.). Filed byAsar Tauf Shakanasa. Consent/Declination due by 8/23/2021. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shakanasa v. Contreras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Asar Tauf Shakanasa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward T. Furnace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Contreras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?