Matias Rauda v. Garland et al
Plaintiff: Willian Matias Rauda
Defendant: Merrick B Garland, Jean King and David Wetmore
Case Number: 3:2021cv05734
Filed: July 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles R Breyer
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1651
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying #18 Motion to Amend/Correct. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2021)
September 8, 2021 Filing 20 REPLY (re #18 MOTION to Amend/Correct #17 Order on Motion for TRO ) filed byWillian Matias Rauda. (Beier, Genna) (Filed on 9/8/2021)
September 1, 2021 Filing 19 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #18 MOTION to Amend/Correct #17 Order on Motion for TRO ) filed byMerrick B Garland, Jean King, David Wetmore. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ingebretsen, Richard) (Filed on 9/1/2021)
August 18, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION to Amend/Correct #17 Order on Motion for TRO filed by Willian Matias Rauda. Motion Hearing set for 9/24/2021 10:00 AM in San Francisco, - To be determined before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Responses due by 9/1/2021. Replies due by 9/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Beier, Genna) (Filed on 8/18/2021)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying #5 Motion for TRO and #1 Petition for a Writ of Mandamus. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2021)
August 3, 2021 Filing 16 REPLY (re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order ) filed byWillian Matias Rauda. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Beier, Genna) (Filed on 8/3/2021)
August 2, 2021 Filing 15 Declaration of Andrea Vermillion in Support of #14 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byMerrick B Garland, Jean King, David Wetmore. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit Exhibit L)(Related document(s) #14 ) (Ingebretsen, Richard) (Filed on 8/2/2021)
August 2, 2021 Filing 14 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order ) filed byMerrick B Garland, Jean King, David Wetmore. (Ingebretsen, Richard) (Filed on 8/2/2021)
August 2, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Gordon Winstead Ingebretsen (Ingebretsen, Richard) (Filed on 8/2/2021)
July 28, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Willian Matias Rauda. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations) Signature Attestation)(Beier, Genna) (Filed on 7/28/2021)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re TRO Briefing Schedule. Response due August 2, 2021. Reply due August 3, 2021. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 7/28/2021. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2021)
July 27, 2021 Filing 10 Case Reassigned to Judge Charles R. Breyer. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (asS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2021)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RELATING CASE. The following cases are related: C21-3897 CRB and C21-5734 SK. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 7/27/2021. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2021)
July 27, 2021 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2021)
July 27, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Merrick B Garland, Jean King, David Wetmore. (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2021)
July 27, 2021 Filing 6 Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2021)
July 27, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Willian Matias Rauda. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Copy of Mandamus Petition)(Beier, Genna) (Filed on 7/27/2021)
July 27, 2021 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Willian Matias Rauda.. (Beier, Genna) (Filed on 7/27/2021)
July 27, 2021 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/10/2021. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2021)
July 27, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Beier, Genna) (Filed on 7/27/2021)
July 27, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Mandamus and Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0971-16219721). Filed byWillian Matias Rauda. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit Exhibits in Support of Petition for Mandamus, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Beier, Genna) (Filed on 7/27/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Matias Rauda v. Garland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willian Matias Rauda
Represented By: Francisco Ugarte
Represented By: Jehan Marie Laner
Represented By: Sean Lai McMahon
Represented By: Genna Ellis Beier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrick B Garland
Represented By: Richard Gordon Winstead Ingebretsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jean King
Represented By: Richard Gordon Winstead Ingebretsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Wetmore
Represented By: Richard Gordon Winstead Ingebretsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?