Xiao v. Forshey et al
Plaintiff: Xiaoqing Xiao
Defendant: Randall Forshey and Sharon Forshey
Case Number: 3:2021cv05866
Filed: July 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Maxine M Chesney
Referring Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2021 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE re remand. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REMANDING ACTION TO STATE COURT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 11, 2021. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 10, 2021 Filing 11 Case Reassigned to Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (asS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2021)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RELATED CASE ORDER. Xiao v. Forshey, 21-cv-2538 MMC, is related to Xiao v. Forshey, 21-cv-5866 JSC. The Clerk of Court is ordered to reassign the later-filed action to the undersigned. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 10, 2021. (mmclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 4, 2021 Filing 9 REFERRAL FOR PURPOSE OF DETERMINING RELATIONSHIP. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 8/4/2021. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 4, 2021 Filing 8 Proposed Order Remanding Case Back to the Superior Court of California, Alameda County by Xiaoqing Xiao. (Osborne, James) (Filed on 8/4/2021)
August 4, 2021 Filing 7 Ex Parte Application for Hearing to Dismiss Defendants' Notice of Removal filed by Xiaoqing Xiao. (Osborne, James) (Filed on 8/4/2021)
August 4, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by James S Osborne, Jr (Osborne, James) (Filed on 8/4/2021)
July 30, 2021 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/21/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/28/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
July 30, 2021 Filing 4 Answer to Removal Complaint filed in Superior Court of California, County of Alameda on November 16, 2020 by Randall Forshey, Sharon Forshey. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2021)
July 30, 2021 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Randall Forshey, Sharon Forshey identifying Corporate Parent Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, As TRUSTEE, ON BEHLAF OF THE HOLDERS OF THE IMPAC SECURED ASSETS CORP., MORTGAGE PASS-THROUGH CERTIFICATES SERIES 2007-1 for Randall Forshey, Sharon Forshey. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2021)
July 30, 2021 Filing 2 ***DISREGARD. SEE DOCKET #3*** Certificate of Interested Entities by Randall Forshey, Sharon Forshey (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2021) Modified on 7/30/2021 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
July 30, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, County of Alameda. Their case number is HG20054492. ( Filing fee $402 Receipt No. 44611017200). Filed by Sharon Forshey, Randall Forshey. Consent/Declination due by 8/13/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Xiao v. Forshey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xiaoqing Xiao
Represented By: Kent Pearce Tierney
Represented By: James S Osborne, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall Forshey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon Forshey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?