Frazier v. HCC Surety Group
Plaintiff: Henry Lee Frazier, Jr. and Henry Frazier
Defendant: HCC Surety Group
Case Number: 3:2021cv06178
Filed: August 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2021 Filing 24 CLERK'S SECOND NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 10/12/2021. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
October 1, 2021 Filing 23 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE; Motion to Serve a Reply to an Answer Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(a)(c) (re #18 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12 b6 ) filed by Henry Frazier. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2021)
September 21, 2021 Filing 22 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Motion Hearing #18 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12 b6 set for 10/28/2021 at 9:30 AM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. The briefing schedule remains the same. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/lb General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only en try generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
September 21, 2021 Filing 21 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 9/28/2021. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
September 20, 2021 Filing 20 Certificate of Interested Entities by HCC Surety Group (Buchanan, Natasha) (Filed on 9/20/2021)
September 20, 2021 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HCC Surety Group (Buchanan, Natasha) (Filed on 9/20/2021)
September 20, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12 b6 filed by HCC Surety Group. Motion Hearing set for 10/28/2021 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Responses due by 10/4/2021. Replies due by 10/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Points of Authorities, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order re Motion to Dismiss)(Buchanan, Natasha) (Filed on 9/20/2021)
September 2, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE by Henry Frazier CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Server (Rodolfo D. Garcia) on 8/31/2012, answer do 10/31/2021. Service of AMENDED COMPLAINT were executed upon HCC Surety Group, 801 S. Figueroa Street, Suite 700, Los Angeles, CA 90017. (Frazier, Henry) (Filed on 9/2/2021)
September 2, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE by Henry Frazier CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Server (Rodolfo D. Garcia) on 8/24/2012, answer do 10/24/2021. Service of Summons and Compliant were executed upon HCC Surety Group, 801 S. Figueroa Street, Suite 700, Los Angeles, CA 90017. (Frazier, Henry) (Filed on 9/2/2021)
August 30, 2021 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT against HCC Surety Group. Filed byHenry Frazier. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2021)
August 24, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE by Henry Frazier PLEASE TAKE NOTICE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Motion and Sentencing Hearing: Agency Moved Court to Revoke Plaintiff's Contractor's License on 11/28/2014, Nine Months After the Statute of Limitation)(Frazier, Henry) (Filed on 8/24/2021)
August 23, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE by Henry Frazier REQUEST JUDICIAL NOTICE: Agencies (HCC Surety Group) vacated Prehearing Conferences and Mandatory Settlement Conferences scheduled between parties on August 28, 2011 and January 15, 2015, In Matter of the Accusation Against Bay West Electric Inc., and Henry Lee Frazier, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Prehearing, #2 Exhibit Matter of Accusation)(Frazier, Henry) (Filed on 8/23/2021)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order granting #8 Motion for Permission for Electronic Case Filing entered by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Authorizing E-Filing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 8/20/2021. (Attachments: #1 Envelope Mailing Service Label)(rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 19, 2021 Filing 10 Amended Declaration of Henry Lee Frazier, Jr. filed by Henry Lee Frazier, Jr. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2021)
August 19, 2021 Filing 9 Amended Proposed Order That relief can be granted pursuant to federal rules of civil procedure 8(a). by Henry Lee Frazier, Jr. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2021)
August 19, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Permission for Electronic Case Filing filed by Henry Lee Frazier, Jr. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2021)
August 19, 2021 Filing 7 DEMAND for Trial by Jury Rule 38 by Henry Lee Frazier, Jr. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2021)
August 19, 2021 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Henry Lee Frazier, Jr. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2021)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE AND ORDER: The attached notice and order notifies the plaintiff of resources available, attaches the district's handbook for litigants who do not have a lawyer, includes a flyer for contacting the court's help desk and instructs the plaintiff about serving the defendants. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 08/11/2021. (Attachments: #1 Self Help Flyer, #2 Pro Se Handbook)(ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 11, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to HCC Surety Group. (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2021)
August 11, 2021 Filing 3 Declaration of Henry Lee Frazier, Jr.. in Support of #1 Complaint, filed byHenry Lee Frazier, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #1 ) (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2021)
August 11, 2021 Filing 2 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/11/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/18/2021 11:00 AM. (Attachments: #1 LB - Standing Order, #2 Standing Order for All Judges)(jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against HCC Surety Group (Filing fee $ 402.00. Receipt no. 44611017214). Filed by Henry Lee Frazier, Jr. Consent/Declination due by 8/25/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Filing Fee Receipt)(jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frazier v. HCC Surety Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Lee Frazier, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Frazier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HCC Surety Group
Represented By: Natasha Kamdar Buchanan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?