Machado v. Velocity Mortgage Capital et al
Plaintiff: Alexandre Machado
Defendant: Velocity Mortgage Capital, Nationstar Mortgage LLC dba Mr. Cooper, Velocity Commercial Capital, LLC doing business as Velocity Mortgage Capital and Nationstar Mortgage LLC doing business as Mr. Cooper
Case Number: 3:2021cv06200
Filed: August 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Referring Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2021 Filing 11 REASSIGNED CASE - NOTICE OF NEW HEARING DATE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Vince Chhabria upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Chhabria's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. Case Management Statement due by 11/3/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/10/2021 at 02:00 PM by Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/vc Court Appearances:< /b< Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at vccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than Thursday, November 4th, 2021 by no later than 10:00AM.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/.< /p< (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.). (bxsS, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Vince Chhabria for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.Signed by the Clerk on 8/27/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 26, 2021 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (wft, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 25, 2021 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Velocity Commercial Capital, LLC.. (Ward, John) (Filed on 8/25/2021)
August 25, 2021 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Nationstar Mortgage LLC.. (Winslow, Natalie) (Filed on 8/25/2021)
August 19, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint byVelocity Mortgage Capital. (Ward, John) (Filed on 8/19/2021)
August 19, 2021 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/2/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/9/2021 at 1:30 PM in Oakland, - To be determined. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order)(wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 18, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint byNationstar Mortgage LLC dba Mr. Cooper. (Winslow, Natalie) (Filed on 8/18/2021)
August 11, 2021 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/25/2021. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2021)
August 11, 2021 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Nationstar Mortgage LLC dba Mr. Cooper identifying Corporate Parent Nationstar Sub2 LLC, Corporate Parent Nationstar Mortgage Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent BlackRock, Inc, Corporate Parent Nationstar Sub1 LLC, Corporate Parent Mr. Cooper Group Inc., Corporate Parent Mr. Cooper for Nationstar Mortgage LLC dba Mr. Cooper. (Winslow, Natalie) (Filed on 8/11/2021)
August 11, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Alameda County Superior Court. Their case number is HG21099852. (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0971-16274473). Filed byNationstar Mortgage LLC dba Mr. Cooper. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Winslow, Natalie) (Filed on 8/11/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Machado v. Velocity Mortgage Capital et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexandre Machado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Velocity Mortgage Capital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC dba Mr. Cooper
Represented By: Natalie L. Winslow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Velocity Commercial Capital, LLC doing business as Velocity Mortgage Capital
Represented By: John Patrick Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC doing business as Mr. Cooper
Represented By: Natalie L. Winslow
Represented By: Justin Donald Balser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?