M. v. ComPsych Employee Assistance Programs, Inc. dba ComPsych Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Lilia M.
Defendant: ComPsych Employee Assistance Programs, Inc. dba ComPsych Corporation, Highmark BCBSD, Inc. and The DuPont Medical Care Plan
Case Number: 3:2021cv06378
Filed: August 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edward M Chen
Referring Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2021 Filing 21 ANSWER to Complaint byComPsych Employee Assistance Programs, Inc. dba ComPsych Corporation. (Klein, Elise) (Filed on 10/12/2021)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #19 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2021)
September 27, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-16434028.) filed by Highmark BCBSD, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Nehring, Molly) (Filed on 9/27/2021)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER IN REASSIGNED CASE: Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/14/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. Joint Case Management Statement due by 12/7/2021. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/23/2021. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2021)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #16 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2021)
September 21, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-16412794.) filed by Highmark BCBSD, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Hanson, Rebecca) (Filed on 9/21/2021)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward M. Chen for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 9/20/21. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2021)
September 20, 2021 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2021)
September 17, 2021 Filing 13 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Highmark BCBSD, Inc... (Braje, Karen) (Filed on 9/17/2021)
September 16, 2021 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant Highmark BCBSD, Inc. shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by September 30, 2021. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2021)
September 15, 2021 Filing 11 STIPULATION re #4 Complaint Joint Stipulation to Extend Responsive Pleading Deadline filed by Highmark BCBSD, Inc.. (Braje, Karen) (Filed on 9/15/2021)
September 7, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lilia M.. Highmark BCBSD, Inc. served on 8/30/2021, answer due 9/20/2021. (Lilienstein, David) (Filed on 9/7/2021)
September 3, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lilia M.. The DuPont Medical Care Plan served on 8/27/2021, answer due 9/17/2021. (Lilienstein, David) (Filed on 9/3/2021)
September 1, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lilia M.. ComPsych Employee Assistance Programs, Inc. dba ComPsych Corporation served on 8/23/2021, answer due 9/13/2021. (Lilienstein, David) (Filed on 9/1/2021)
August 30, 2021 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Lilia M... (Lilienstein, David) (Filed on 8/30/2021)
August 20, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to ComPsych Employee Assistance Programs, Inc. dba ComPsych Corporation, Highmark BCBSD, Inc., The DuPont Medical Care Plan. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2021)
August 20, 2021 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/11/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/18/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2021)
August 19, 2021 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed byLilia M.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lilienstein, David) (Filed on 8/19/2021)
August 18, 2021 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/1/2021. (asS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2021)
August 18, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Spielman, Katie) (Filed on 8/18/2021)
August 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-16296555.). Filed byLilia M.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lilienstein, David) (Filed on 8/18/2021)
August 18, 2021 #Electronic filing error. Please verify Nature of suit on Civil Cover Sheet please post corrected civil cover sheet with correct nature of suit. No judge assignment will be made un til the document is e-filed. Submit your document using Civil Events > Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover SheetThis filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Re: #1 Complaint filed by Lilia M. (asS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: M. v. ComPsych Employee Assistance Programs, Inc. dba ComPsych Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lilia M.
Represented By: Katie Joy Spielman
Represented By: David M. Lilienstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ComPsych Employee Assistance Programs, Inc. dba ComPsych Corporation
Represented By: Elise Dale Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Highmark BCBSD, Inc.
Represented By: Karen A. Braje
Represented By: Rebecca Renee Hanson
Represented By: Molly Nehring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The DuPont Medical Care Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?