Doe v. TruthFinder, LLC
Plaintiff: John Doe and Robert Williams
Defendant: TruthFinder, LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv06559
Filed: August 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Referring Judge: James Donato
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER. The motion to compel arbitration, Dkt. No. 9, is suitable for decision without oral argument pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-1(b). The hearing that was set for October 21, 2021, is vacated. The motion to dismiss, Dkt. No. 9, is terminated without prejudice pending the Court's order on the motion to compel arbitration. Signed by Judge James Donato on 10/18/2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2021)
September 22, 2021 Filing 19 REPLY (re #9 MOTION to Dismiss or Compel Arbitration ) filed byTruthFinder, LLC. (Apple, Sean) (Filed on 9/22/2021)
September 15, 2021 Filing 18 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #9 MOTION to Dismiss or Compel Arbitration ) PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT TRUTHFINDER, LLCS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION OR, IN THE ALERNATIVE, TO DISMISS filed byRobert Williams. (Fok, Devin) (Filed on 9/15/2021)
September 10, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss or Compel Arbitration. Motion Hearing set for 10/21/2021 10:00 AM before Judge James Donato. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2021)
September 9, 2021 Filing 17 Renotice motion hearing re #9 MOTION to Dismiss or Compel Arbitration filed byTruthFinder, LLC. (Related document(s) #9 ) (Tyz, Ryan) (Filed on 9/9/2021)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/9/2021 10:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 12/2/2021. Signed by Judge James Donato on 9/9/2021. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2021)
September 8, 2021 Filing 15 Case reassigned to Judge James Donato. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins no longer assigned to the case. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2021)
September 8, 2021 Filing 14 This case will be randomly reassigned to a District Judge outside the San Jose Division pursuant to the Caseload Rebalancing Pilot Program approved by the Court effective March 1, 2018. For information, visit our web page at #http://cand.uscourts.gov/news/225. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2021)
September 7, 2021 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2021)
September 3, 2021 Filing 12 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Robert Williams.. (Fok, Devin) (Filed on 9/3/2021)
September 1, 2021 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination. Plaintiff is requested to file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 9/8/2021. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2021)
September 1, 2021 Filing 10 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by TruthFinder, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sean Apple, #2 Exhibit 1 to Tyz Decl. (PUBLIC), #3 Exhibit 1 to Tyz Decl. (SEALED), #4 Exhibit 2 to Tyz Decl. (SEALED), #5 Proposed Order, #6 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Apple, Sean) (Filed on 9/1/2021)
September 1, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss or Compel Arbitration filed by TruthFinder, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 10/6/2021 01:00 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Responses due by 9/15/2021. Replies due by 9/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew Johnson, #2 Exhibit 1 to Johnson Decl., #3 Declaration of Ryan Tyz, #4 Exhibit 1 to Tyz Decl., #5 Exhibit 2 to Tyz Decl., #6 Exhibit 3 to Tyz Decl., #7 Exhibit 4 to Tyz Decl., #8 Proposed Order)(Apple, Sean) (Filed on 9/1/2021)
September 1, 2021 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by TruthFinder, LLC.. (Apple, Sean) (Filed on 9/1/2021)
September 1, 2021 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES, DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against TruthFinder, LLC. Filed byJohn Doe. (Fok, Devin) (Filed on 9/1/2021)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO FILE Motion to Proceed Under Pseudonym. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 8/25/2021. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2021)
August 25, 2021 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/17/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/24/2021 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2021)
August 25, 2021 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/8/2021. (asS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2021)
August 25, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Tyz (Tyz, Ryan) (Filed on 8/25/2021)
August 25, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TruthFinder, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Pubrec LLC for TruthFinder, LLC. (Apple, Sean) (Filed on 8/25/2021)
August 25, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California Santa Clara County. Their case number is 21CV381993. (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0971-16319030). Filed byTruthFinder, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Apple, Sean) (Filed on 8/25/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. TruthFinder, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Represented By: Devin Heng Fok
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Williams
Represented By: Devin Heng Fok
Represented By: Ainat Kiewe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TruthFinder, LLC
Represented By: Ryan Tyz
Represented By: Sean Kristofer Apple
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?