Bayview Loan Servicing,LLC v. Stanley et al
Plaintiff: Bayview Loan Servicing,LLC
Defendant: Dave Stanley, Lisa J Stanley, UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS OFFICE OF THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA and United States of America
Case Number: 3:2021cv06638
Filed: August 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Joseph C Spero
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2021 Filing 17 CLERK'S THIRD NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendant Dave Stanley & Lisa Stanley shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 11/2/2021. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)Copy placed in O:Drive on 10/19/2021 for the Stanley Defendants.
October 13, 2021 Filing 16 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Bayview Loan Servicing,LLC. Amended Proof of Service. (Harris, Seth) (Filed on 10/13/2021)
October 13, 2021 Filing 15 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Bayview Loan Servicing,LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Harris, Seth) (Filed on 10/13/2021)
September 29, 2021 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America re #11 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) (Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 9/29/2021)
September 29, 2021 Filing 13 CLERK'S SECOND NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff & Defendants Dave Stanley & Lisa Stanley shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 10/13/2021. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)Copy placed in O:Drive on 9/29/2021 as to the Stanley Defendants.
September 28, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Seth Michael Harris (Harris, Seth) (Filed on 9/28/2021)
September 27, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by United States of America. (Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 9/27/2021)
September 20, 2021 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America re #9 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge (Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 9/20/2021)
September 20, 2021 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by United States of America.. (Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 9/20/2021)
September 13, 2021 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 9/27/2021. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)Copy placed in O:Drive to Dave Stanley & Lisa Stanley on 9/13/2021.
September 7, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America re #6 Stipulation (Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 9/7/2021)
September 3, 2021 Filing 6 STIPULATION To Extend Time Within Which to Answer or Respond filed by United States of America. (Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 9/3/2021)
September 1, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America Proof of Service (Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 9/1/2021)
August 30, 2021 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/26/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/3/2021 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 27, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS OFFICE OF THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA re #1 Notice of Removal, (Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 8/27/2021)
August 27, 2021 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/10/2021. (asS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2021)
August 27, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of CA, County of Sonoma. Their case number is SCV-266245. (). Filed byUNITED STATES ATTORNEYS OFFICE OF THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 8/27/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bayview Loan Servicing,LLC v. Stanley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bayview Loan Servicing,LLC
Represented By: Kelsey Xuan Luu
Represented By: Melissa Robbins Coutts
Represented By: Seth Michael Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave Stanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa J Stanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS OFFICE OF THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA
Represented By: Adrienne Zack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Adrienne Zack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?