Primary Productions LLC v. Apple Inc
Plaintiff: Primary Productions LLC
Defendant: Apple Inc
Case Number: 3:2021cv06841
Filed: September 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 2
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2021 Filing 32 MOTION to Dismiss and Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by Apple Inc. Motion Hearing set for 10/14/2021 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Responses due by 9/16/2021. Replies due by 9/23/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rachel Brass, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Proposed Order)(Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 9/2/2021)
September 2, 2021 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Julian Wolfe Kleinbrodt for Apple Inc. (Kleinbrodt, Julian) (Filed on 9/2/2021)
September 2, 2021 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark A. Perry for Apple Inc. (Perry, Mark) (Filed on 9/2/2021)
September 2, 2021 Filing 29 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff and Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by September 16, 2021. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2021)
September 2, 2021 Filing 28 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/25/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/2/2021 at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2021)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER ON MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE granting #18 Motion to Change Venue; finding as moot #23 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; finding as moot #25 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; finding as moot #17 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; By Judge Jon D. Levy (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2021)
August 13, 2021 Filing 26 NOTICE: regarding filing made as #24 OBJECTION to #22 Reply to Response to Motion: This entry was modified to correctly reflect it is a SUR-REPLY to #18 MOTION to Change Venue and NOT an OBJECTION. There is no Response to Objection deadline being tracked by the Court. (mlm) (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2021)
August 12, 2021 Filing 25 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and MOTION for Expedited Discovery filed by Primary Productions LLC. Responses due by 9/2/2021. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2021)
August 11, 2021 Filing 24 SUR-REPLY to #18 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Primary Productions LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Opposition to Venue Transfer Filed in New Hampshire)(wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2021)
August 6, 2021 Filing 23 MOTION to Extend of Time to File Answer filed by Apple Inc. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2021)
August 6, 2021 Filing 22 REPLY to Response to Motion re #18 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Apple Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Peter Brann, #2 Exhibit A - Comparison Amended Complaint to Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Comparison Amended Complaint to CA Complaint)(wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2021)
August 2, 2021 Filing 21 First AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED AS OF RIGHT against Apple Inc. Filed by Primary Productions LLC. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2021)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER terminating #9 Order to Show Cause. By Judge Magistrate Judge John H. Rich III on 7/20/2021. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2021)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER mooting #15 Objection to Plaintiff's Corporate Disclosure Statement See ECF No. 16. The Court cautions Plaintiff's counsel about the use of ad hominem references to opposing counsel. By Judge Magistrate Judge John H. Rich III on 7/20/2021. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2021)
July 12, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Apple Inc. Responses due by 8/2/2021. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Mark Rollins, #2 Exhibit A - Developer Agreement, #3 Exhibit B - DPLA, #4 Exhibit C - App Store Review Guidelines)(wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2021)
July 12, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Apple Inc. Responses due by 8/2/2021. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Peter Brann, #2 Exhibit A - Apple Developer Agreement, #3 Exhibit B - Apple Developer Program License, #4 Exhibit C - App Store Review Guidelines, #5 Exhibit D - Coronavirus Reporter v Apple, #6 Exhibit E - Epic Games v Apple, #7 Exhibit F - Cameron v Apple, #8 Exhibit G - SaurikIT LLC v Apple)(wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2021)
July 6, 2021 Filing 16 Response to #9 Order to Show Cause by Primary Productions LLC. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2021)
July 2, 2021 Filing 15 OBJECTION to re #11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Apple Inc. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2021)
July 1, 2021 Filing 14 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Mark A. Perry filed by Peter J. Brann on behalf of Apple Inc (Total admission fee $100 receipt number AMEDC-2515750-Admission fee canceled, was paid at pleading #12 receipt number AMEDC-2515740). (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2021)
July 1, 2021 Filing 13 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Zachary B. Copeland filed by Peter J. Brann on behalf of by Apple Inc. (Total admission fee $100 receipt number AMEDC-2515746-Admission fee canceled, fee was paid at pleading #12 receipt number AMEDC-2515740). (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2021) (wsnS, COURT STAFF).
July 1, 2021 Filing 12 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Rachel S. Brass filed by Peter J. Brann on behalf of by Apple Inc. (Total admission fee $300 receipt number AMEDC-2515740). (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2021)
June 30, 2021 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Primary Productions LLC. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2021) (wsnS, COURT STAFF).
June 24, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification regarding #9 Order to Show Cause: This entry has been modified to correctly reflect name of missing judge; from Judge Levy to Judge Rich (aks). (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2021)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 7/1/2021. By Judge John H. Rich III on 6/24/2021. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2021)
June 11, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Stacy O. Stitham on behalf of Apple Inc. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2021)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The defendant shall respond to the plaintiff's complaint by July 12,201. By Judge Magistrate Judge John H. Rich III. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2021)
June 10, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Apple Inc. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2021)
June 10, 2021 Filing 5 Statement of Non-Opposition re #4 MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint filed by Primary Productions LLC. (Related document(s) #4 ) (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2021)
June 3, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint filed by Apple Inc. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2021) (wsnS, COURT STAFF).
May 17, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Apple Inc. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2021)
May 17, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by Primary Productions LLC. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2021)
May 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Apple Inc. Filed by Primary Productions LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A - facts uncovered by the House report applicable to Apple, #2 Exhibit B - findings of Cravath)(wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2021)
May 17, 2021 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card (Filing fee $402 receipt number AMEDC-2492884), filed by Primary Productions LLC. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Primary Productions LLC v. Apple Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Primary Productions LLC
Represented By: Keith Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc
Represented By: Mark A. Perry
Represented By: Rachel S. Brass
Represented By: Julian Wolfe Kleinbrodt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?