Raney v. San Mateo County et al
Plaintiff: LV Raney, III
Defendant: San Mateo County, Sheriff Carlos Bolanos and Doers 1-12 (Sheriffs & C/Os)
Case Number: 3:2021cv06871
Filed: September 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: PSLC AGB
Referring Judge: James Donato
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2021 Filing 8 Mail sent to LV Raney returned as undeliverable re #6 Order, #5 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis,. Mail Returned; response required by 12/17/2021. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2021)
October 15, 2021 Mailed copies of orders #5 , #6 to plaintiff at new address on Howard Street; enclosed blank complaint form. (ljf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2021)
October 5, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Change of Address by LV Raney, III. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2021)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER RE DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge James Donato on 10/5/2021. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
September 3, 2021 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 10/12/2021. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
September 3, 2021 Filing 3 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by LV Raney, III. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2021)
September 3, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by LV Raney, III. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2021)
September 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Carlos Bolanos, Doers 1-12 (Sheriffs & C/Os), San Mateo County. Filed by LV Raney, III. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2021) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/13/2021: #2 Note) (jmlS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Raney v. San Mateo County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LV Raney, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Mateo County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Carlos Bolanos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doers 1-12 (Sheriffs & C/Os)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?