Christ v. Trump
Plaintiff: Jesus Christ and Michelle Yvonne Wood
Defendant: Donald John Trump
Case Number: 3:2021cv07140
Filed: September 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Referring Judge: Thomas S Hixson
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2021 Filing 9 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 10/4/2021. (vclc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2021)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order by Judge Vince Chhabria adopting #4 Report and Recommendations. (vclc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
September 20, 2021 Filing 7 OBJECTION to #4 Report and Recommendations by Jesus Christ. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2021)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Vince Chhabria for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 9/20/21. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
September 17, 2021 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Complaint filed by Jesus Christ; ORDER GRANTING #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Objections due by 10/1/2021. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 9/17/2021. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
September 15, 2021 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 12/9/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/16/2021 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (Attachments: #(1) Standing Order for Mag. Judge Thomas S. Hixson and Standing Order for All Judges) (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
September 15, 2021 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jesus Christ. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2021)
September 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (no process) against Donald John Trump, (Filing Fee: ifpp entered on 9/15/2021). Filed by Jesus Christ. Consent/Declination due by 9/29/2021. (Attachments: #(1) Civil Cover Sheet) (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Christ v. Trump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus Christ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Yvonne Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald John Trump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?