Pelacos v. Sivongsa et al
Plaintiff: Estaban Pelacos
Defendant: C.O. Sivongsa, CO Garicar, CO Garibay and CO Quiteves
Case Number: 3:2021cv07177
Filed: September 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Referring Judge: PSLC RMH
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (bxsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
October 8, 2021 Filing 4 Prison Trust Fund Account Statement by Estaban Pelacos. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2021)
October 8, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Estaban Pelacos. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2021)
September 24, 2021 Mailed copy of #2 to Plaintiff. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2021)
September 16, 2021 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 10/25/2021. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
September 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Garibay, Garicar, Quiteves, Sivongsa. Filed byEstaban Pelacos. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2021) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/17/2021: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope) (hdjS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pelacos v. Sivongsa et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estaban Pelacos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.O. Sivongsa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO Garicar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO Garibay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO Quiteves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?