Unlockd Media, Inc. Liquidation Trust v. Google LLC et al
Plaintiff: Unlockd Media, Inc. Liquidation Trust
Defendant: Google LLC, Google Ireland Limited, Google Commerce Limited, Alphabet, Inc. and Google Asia Pacific Pte. Ltd.
Case Number: 3:2021cv07250
Filed: September 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Alex G Tse
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 2
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2021 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Unlockd Media, Inc. Liquidation Trust ("Affidavit of Service on Alphabet Inc.") (Chesler, Evan) (Filed on 9/30/2021)
September 30, 2021 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Unlockd Media, Inc. Liquidation Trust ("Affidavit of Service on Google LLC") (Chesler, Evan) (Filed on 9/30/2021)
September 30, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Allan B. Diamond, (Filing Fee: $317.00, receipt number 0971-16450317) filed by Unlockd Media, Inc. Liquidation Trust. (Diamond, Allan) (Filed on 9/30/2021)
September 30, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Sevana Zadourian (Zadourian, Sevana) (Filed on 9/30/2021)
September 30, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Daniel Sullivan (Sullivan, Christopher) (Filed on 9/30/2021)
September 21, 2021 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Defendants Alphabet, Inc., Google Asia Pacific Pte. Ltd., Google Commerce Limited, Google Ireland Limited, Google LLC. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2021)
September 21, 2021 Filing 10 Proposed Summons. (Chesler, Evan) (Filed on 9/21/2021)
September 21, 2021 Filing 9 Proposed Summons. (Chesler, Evan) (Filed on 9/21/2021)
September 21, 2021 Filing 8 Proposed Summons. (Chesler, Evan) (Filed on 9/21/2021)
September 21, 2021 Filing 7 Proposed Summons. (Chesler, Evan) (Filed on 9/21/2021)
September 21, 2021 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. (Chesler, Evan) (Filed on 9/21/2021)
September 20, 2021 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/10/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/17/2021 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom A, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2021)
September 20, 2021 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/4/2021. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2021)
September 17, 2021 Filing 3 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons filed by Unlockd Media, Inc. Liquidation Trust re #1 Complaint (Chesler, Evan) (Filed on 9/17/2021)
September 17, 2021 Filing 2 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of the Complaint filed by Unlockd Media, Inc. Liquidation Trust. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Peter S. Kaufman, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Unredacted Complaint)(Chesler, Evan) (Filed on 9/17/2021)
September 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY TRIAL DEMAND (Redacted Version) against Alphabet, Inc., Google Asia Pacific Pte. Ltd., Google Commerce Limited, Google Ireland Limited, Google LLC. Filed by Unlockd Media, Inc. Liquidation Trust. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Chesler, Evan) (Filed on 9/17/2021) Modified on 9/20/2021 (slhS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Unlockd Media, Inc. Liquidation Trust v. Google LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Unlockd Media, Inc. Liquidation Trust
Represented By: Evan R. Chesler
Represented By: Keith R Hummel
Represented By: Lauren Rosenberg
Represented By: Yonatan Even
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Ireland Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Commerce Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alphabet, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Asia Pacific Pte. Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?