Town Center Storage, LP v. AmTrust International Underwriters, Ltd.
Plaintiff: Town Center Storage, LP
Defendant: AmTrust International Underwriters, Ltd.
Case Number: 3:2021cv07310
Filed: September 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Referring Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER of Dismissal. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 11/18/2021. (vclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2021)
November 17, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE by Town Center Storage, LP of Settlement (Selvin, Gary) (Filed on 11/17/2021)
October 28, 2021 Filing 20 Second Joint Stipulation to Extend Time for AmTrust to Respond to re #1 Complaint filed by AmTrust International Underwriters, Ltd.. (Hsu, Linda) (Filed on 10/28/2021)
October 21, 2021 Filing 19 REASSIGNED CASE - NOTICE OF NEW HEARING DATE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Vince Chhabria upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Chhabria's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. Case Management Statement due by 12/8/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/15/2021 at 01:00 PM by Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/vc Court Appearances : Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at vccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than Friday, December 10th, 2021, by no later than 10:00AM.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/ . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.). (bxsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2021)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Vince Chhabria for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 10/21/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2021)
October 20, 2021 Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2021)
October 19, 2021 Filing 16 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by AmTrust International Underwriters, Ltd... (Hsu, Linda) (Filed on 10/19/2021)
October 12, 2021 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE TO DEFENDANT Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 10/26/2021. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2021)
October 11, 2021 Filing 14 JOINT STIPULATION to Extend Time for AmTrust to Respond to re #1 Complaint filed by AmTrust International Underwriters, Ltd.. (Hsu, Linda) (Filed on 10/11/2021)
October 11, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Linda Sharon Wendell Hsu and Samuel Lipsitz (Hsu, Linda) (Filed on 10/11/2021)
September 28, 2021 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Town Center Storage, LP re #1 Complaint, Proof of Service on Amtrust International Underwriters, Ltd. (Selvin, Gary) (Filed on 9/28/2021)
September 27, 2021 Filing 11 Certificate of Interested Entities by Town Center Storage, LP identifying Corporate Parent Town Center Storage, LP, Other Affiliate Patricia Morgan, Other Affiliate R.R.P. Development Co., Other Affiliate RP&JP Limited Partnership, Other Affiliate Kevin Pratt, Other Affiliate Michael Fogelman, Other Affiliate Pratt Partnerships Nonrevocable Trust 2019, Other Affiliate The Russell R. Pratt Nonrevocable Trust, dated December 31, 2012, Other Affiliate Dana Pratt, Other Affiliate Joan Friedman Nonrevocable Trust 2018, Other Affiliate Jennifer McConnell, Other Affiliate Elias Fogelman Nonrevocable Trust, Other Affiliate Kevin Pratt and Audrey Alves Children's Nonrevocable Trust, dated December 28, 2012, Other Affiliate Elias Fogelman Nonrevocable Trust, dated December 31, 2012, Other Affiliate Naomi Fogelman Nonrevocable Trust, dated December 31, 2012, Other Affiliate Benjamin McConnell Nonrevocable Trust, dated December 31, 2012, Other Affiliate Jackson McConnell Nonrevocable Trust, dated December 31, 2012 for Town Center Storage, LP. (Selvin, Gary) (Filed on 9/27/2021)
September 22, 2021 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to AmTrust International Underwriters, Ltd.. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2021)
September 22, 2021 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Town Center Storage, LP.. (Selvin, Gary) (Filed on 9/22/2021)
September 21, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Town Center Storage, LP as to AmTrust International Underwriters, Ltd.. returning summons Dkt 6 (misspelling of street name) (Selvin, Gary) (Filed on 9/21/2021)
September 21, 2021 Filing 7 Proposed Summons. (Selvin, Gary) (Filed on 9/21/2021)
September 21, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to AmTrust International Underwriters, Ltd. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2021)
September 21, 2021 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/22/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/29/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2021)
September 20, 2021 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/4/2021. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2021)
September 20, 2021 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Selvin, Gary) (Filed on 9/20/2021)
September 20, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Selvin, Gary) (Filed on 9/20/2021)
September 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AmTrust International Underwriters, Ltd. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-16407913.). Filed byTown Center Storage, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Selvin, Gary) (Filed on 9/20/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Town Center Storage, LP v. AmTrust International Underwriters, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Town Center Storage, LP
Represented By: Gary Robert Selvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmTrust International Underwriters, Ltd.
Represented By: Linda Sharon Wendell Hsu
Represented By: Samuel Ellis Lipsitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?