Asmelashe v. Guess
Plaintiff: Almaz Asmelashe
Defendant: Lee Guess
Case Number: 3:2021cv07354
Filed: September 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2021 Filing 7 CLERK'S SECOND NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 11/29/2021. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 11/29/2021. (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
October 24, 2021 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 11/8/2021. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)Copy placed in O:Drive on 10/24/2021
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCREENING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and ordering HOLD on service of complaint. Amended Complaint due by November 29, 2021. (sklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
September 22, 2021 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/13/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/20/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
September 21, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Almaz Asmelashe. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2021)
September 21, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2021)
September 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lee Guess. Filed byAlmaz Asmelashe. Consent/Declination due by 10/5/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Asmelashe v. Guess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Almaz Asmelashe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Guess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?