Lindblad v. Han Lin Auction Gallery et al
Plaintiff: Robert Lindblad
Defendant: Han Lin Auction Gallery, Chien Lung Antiques and Think Tank Learning
Case Number: 3:2021cv07548
Filed: September 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2021 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Chien Lung Antiques, Han Lin Auction Gallery, Think Tank Learning. Filed byRobert Lindblad. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2021)
October 28, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Rule 65 filed by Robert Lindblad. Responses due by 11/12/2021. Replies due by 11/19/2021. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2021)
October 28, 2021 Filing 10 REQUEST is to the Chief Justice of Northern California, Chief Justice Richard Seeborg to create an injunction against any parties in case Lindblad v. Westmore, Case 21-07548 JSC. The petitioner send this request. filed by Robert Lindblad. Responses due by 11/12/2021. Replies due by 11/19/2021. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2021) Modified on 10/28/2021 (cv, COURT STAFF).
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCREENING ORDER PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1915. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 10/25/2021. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
October 22, 2021 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Robert Lindblad. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2021)
October 21, 2021 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Robert Lindblad. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2021)
October 19, 2021 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by November 2, 2021. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)Emailed to Plaintiff on 10/19/2021 at lindblad2716@aol.com.
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Under 1915 Review/No Service. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
October 4, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Amend/Correct filed by Robert Lindblad. Responses due by 10/18/2021. Replies due by 10/25/2021. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jlgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2021)
September 30, 2021 Copy of Consent/Declination sent to Plaintiff. (jlgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2021)
September 27, 2021 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/23/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/30/2021 at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order)(wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
September 27, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Robert Lindblad. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2021)
September 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. No process. IFPP. Filed by Robert Lindblad. Consent/Declination due by 10/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope)(wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lindblad v. Han Lin Auction Gallery et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Lindblad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Han Lin Auction Gallery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chien Lung Antiques
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Think Tank Learning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?