Lewis County v. McKinsey & Company Inc
Plaintiff: Lewis County
Defendant: McKinsey & Company Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv07648
Filed: September 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles R Breyer
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2021 Filing 10 Case transferred in from District of Washington Western; Case Number 2:21-cv-01224. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 29, 2021 MEMBER CASE OPENED MDL 2996: Western District of Washington (Seattle), 2:21-cv-01224-JRC, Lewis County v. McKinsey & Company Inc, Opened in California Northern District as 3:21-cv-07648-CRB pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 13 cc: JPMDL (jlgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2021)
September 23, 2021 Filing 9 MDL 2996 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO 13); in re MCKINSEY & COMPANY, INC., NATIONAL; transferred to the Northern District of California; assigned to Judge Breyer. (Attachments: #1 CTO Transfer email)(LH)
September 22, 2021 Filing 8 CONSENT filed by all parties to proceed before a Magistrate Judge. (KAM)
September 22, 2021 Filing 7 Notice of Filing Deficiency re #4 Jury Demand. ***Action Required*** The Complaint was erroneously attached instead of a Jury Demand.See attached letter for more information and instructions. Thank you. (KAM)
September 14, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Stay of Proceedings Pending Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1407 and For Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint, filed by Defendant McKinsey & Company Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 9/24/2021, (Peck, Ashley)
September 13, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 9/20/2021. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (KEB)
September 9, 2021 Filing 4 DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Defendant McKinsey & Company Inc (Peck, Ashley)
September 9, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Filing Deficiency re #1 Notice of Removal,. ***Action Required*** Notice of Removal - Jury Demand Improperly Submitted.See attached letter for more information and instructions. (SG)
September 9, 2021 Filing 2 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (SG)
September 9, 2021 Judge J Richard Creatura added. (SG)
September 9, 2021 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Defendant must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 9/16/2021. (SG)
September 8, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 21-2-10826-8 SEA; (Receipt # AWAWDC-7241181) Attorney Ashley A Peck added to party McKinsey & Company Inc(pty:dft), filed by McKinsey & Company Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Summons, #3 Exhibit B - Notice of Removal, #4 Complaint, #5 Jury Demand, #6 Certificate of Service)(Peck, Ashley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis County v. McKinsey & Company Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lewis County
Represented By: Aaron D Bigby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKinsey & Company Inc.
Represented By: Ashley A Peck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?