Yoo et al v. SAFECO Insurance Company of America et al
Plaintiff: Ryan Yoo and Jisun Yoo
Defendant: SAFECO Insurance Company of America, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company and DOES 1 through 10,
Case Number: 3:2021cv07723
Filed: October 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Hixson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Change of Address by J. Edward Kerley, Jr (Kerley, J.) (Filed on 11/18/2021)
October 4, 2021 Filing 6 Civil Cover Sheet by Jisun Yoo, Ryan Yoo - REVISED -. (Kerley, J.) (Filed on 10/4/2021)
October 4, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, SAFECO Insurance Company of America. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2021)
October 4, 2021 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/30/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/6/2022 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2021)
October 4, 2021 Case has been randomly assigned to judge, however incorrect Civil Cover Sheet JS CAND 44 (Rev. 08/16) used at case opening. Please complete and re-file as a separate docket entry correct Civil Cover Sheet of JS 44 (Rev. 10/2020) Re:[1. #1 filed by Jisun Yoo, Ryan Yoo (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2021)
October 1, 2021 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/15/2021. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2021)
October 1, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Kerley, J.) (Filed on 10/1/2021)
October 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DOES 1 through 10,, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, SAFECO Insurance Company of America ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-16454773.). Filed byRyan Yoo, Jisun Yoo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kerley, J.) (Filed on 10/1/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yoo et al v. SAFECO Insurance Company of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Yoo
Represented By: J. Edward Kerley, Jr.
Represented By: Dylan Leon Schaffer
Represented By: Reuthana Tap
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jisun Yoo
Represented By: J. Edward Kerley, Jr.
Represented By: Dylan Leon Schaffer
Represented By: Reuthana Tap
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAFECO Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?