Veeva Systems Inc. et al v. IQVIA Inc.
Plaintiff: Veeva Systems Inc. and Peter Stark
Defendant: IQVIA Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv07749
Filed: October 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2021 Filing 15 REPLY (re #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction ) filed byPeter Stark, Veeva Systems Inc.. (Baker, Christopher) (Filed on 11/23/2021)
November 22, 2021 Filing 14 Letter from Marc H. Axelbaum to the Hon. Vince Chhabria. (Axelbaum, Marc) (Filed on 11/22/2021)
November 16, 2021 Filing 13 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction ) filed byIQVIA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Marc H. Axelbaum, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Rutherford, Athena) (Filed on 11/16/2021)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #11 Motion for Pro Hac Vice - Taber. (bxs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2021)
November 10, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-16616436.) filed by IQVIA Inc.. (Taber, Kenneth) (Filed on 11/10/2021)
November 2, 2021 Filing 10 Request for Judicial Notice re #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed byPeter Stark, Veeva Systems Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit RJN Exh. 1 Veeva First Amended Complaint in IMS Action, #2 Exhibit RJN Exh. 2 Appellate Court Opinion in IMS Action, #3 Exhibit RJN Exh. 3 IQVIA Answer in IMS Action, #4 Exhibit RJN Exh. 4 IQVIA Complaint in Khan I Action, #5 Exhibit RJN Exh. 5 Veeva-Khan Motion to Dismiss in Khan I, #6 Exhibit RJN Exh. 6 IQVIA brief in Khan I re subject matter jurisdiction, #7 Exhibit RJN Exh. 7 Veeva-Khan brief in Khan I re subject matter jurisdiction, #8 Exhibit RJN Exh. 8 Md district court opinion in Khan I re subject matter jurisdiction, #9 Exhibit RJN Exh. 9 IQVIA Complaint in Khan II Action, #10 Exhibit RJN Exh. 10 Md state court decision re preliminary injunction)(Related document(s) #9 ) (Baker, Christopher) (Filed on 11/2/2021)
November 2, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand to State Court for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by Peter Stark, Veeva Systems Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 12/9/2021 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor before Judge Vince Chhabria. Responses due by 11/16/2021. Replies due by 11/23/2021. (Baker, Christopher) (Filed on 11/2/2021)
October 7, 2021 Filing 8 REASSIGNED CASE - NOTICE OF NEW HEARING DATE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Vince Chhabria upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Chhabria's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/5/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/12/2022 at 01:00 PM by Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/vc Court Appearan ces: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at vccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than Thursday, January 6th, 2022, by no later than 10:00AM.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/< /A<. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.). (bxsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2021)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Vince Chhabria for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins no longer assigned to case, Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 10/7/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2021)
October 6, 2021 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2021)
October 6, 2021 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Peter Stark, Veeva Systems Inc... (Baker, Christopher) (Filed on 10/6/2021)
October 5, 2021 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/29/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/5/2022 10:00 AM. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2021)
October 5, 2021 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/19/2021. (asS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2021)
October 4, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by IQVIA Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF ACTION PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1331, 1441 (FEDERAL QUESTION) (Axelbaum, Marc) (Filed on 10/4/2021)
October 4, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF ACTION PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1331, 1441 (FEDERAL QUESTION) from Alameda County Superior. Their case number is RG21111679]. (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0971-16461120). Filed byIQVIA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A - E)(Axelbaum, Marc) (Filed on 10/4/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Veeva Systems Inc. et al v. IQVIA Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veeva Systems Inc.
Represented By: Christopher David Baker
Represented By: Deborah R. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Stark
Represented By: Christopher David Baker
Represented By: Deborah R. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IQVIA Inc.
Represented By: Marc H. Axelbaum
Represented By: Athena Grace Rutherford
Represented By: Kenneth W. Taber
Represented By: Marcia Lynn Pope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?