Jacobs v. CDCR et al
Plaintiff: Kantee W. Jacobs
Defendant: CDCR and Gavin Newsom
Case Number: 3:2021cv07846
Filed: October 6, 2021
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: PSLC MWD
Referring Judge: William H Orrick
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Kantee W. Jacobs. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2021)
October 8, 2021 Mailed copy of #3 to plaintiff. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2021)
October 6, 2021 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 11/15/2021. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2021)
October 6, 2021 Filing 2 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Kantee W. Jacobs. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2021)
October 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CDCR, Gavin Newsom. Filed by Kantee W. Jacobs. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jacobs v. CDCR et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kantee W. Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CDCR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gavin Newsom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?