Chana v. FCA US LLC et al
Plaintiff: Devinder Chana
Defendant: FCA US LLC and San Leandro Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram
Case Number: 3:2021cv07870
Filed: October 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edward M Chen
Referring Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2023 Filing 44 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/10/2023. (vla, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2023)
February 8, 2023 Filing 43 Request for Entry of Judgment filed by Devinder Chana. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] JUDGMENT)(Dolin, Tionna) (Filed on 2/8/2023) Modified on 2/8/2023 (tn, COURT STAFF).
January 12, 2023 Filing 42 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE JURISDICTION filed by Devinder Chana. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION FOR ORDER TO CONTINUE PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES, COSTS, AND EXPENSES AND JURISDICTION)(Dolin, Tionna) (Filed on 1/12/2023)
December 29, 2022 Filing 41 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/29/2022. (bxs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2022)
December 28, 2022 Filing 40 Proposed Order re #39 Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment Request for Entry of Judgment Pursuant to FRCP 68(a) by Devinder Chana. (Dolin, Tionna) (Filed on 12/28/2022)
December 28, 2022 Filing 39 NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by Devinder Chana Request for Entry of Judgment Pursuant to FRCP 68(a) (Dolin, Tionna) (Filed on 12/28/2022)
December 22, 2022 Filing 38 REPLY (re #35 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings ) filed byFCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Mayo, James) (Filed on 12/22/2022)
December 15, 2022 Filing 37 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #35 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings ) filed byDevinder Chana. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Law, Daniel) (Filed on 12/15/2022)
December 1, 2022 Filing 35 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by FCA US LLC. Motion Hearing set for 1/5/2023 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M Chen. Responses due by 12/15/2022. Replies due by 12/22/2022. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities ISO of MJOP, #2 Declaration of JPM iso MJOP, #3 Exhibit A of JPM DECL, #4 Exhibit B of JPM DECL, #5 Proposed Order, #6 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Mayo, James) (Filed on 12/1/2022)
November 28, 2022 Filing 34 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING TIME FOR 11/29/2022 STATUS CONFERENCE. Status Conference reset to 11/29/2022 at 03:45 PM by Videoconference Only before Judge Edward M Chen. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/emcGeneral Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(bxs, COURT S TAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2022)
November 23, 2022 Filing 33 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Status Conference set for 11/29/2022 at 02:30 PM by Videoconference Only before Judge Edward M Chen. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/emcGeneral Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephon e or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(bxs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2022)
November 22, 2022 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Reshma Amarlal Bajaj (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bajaj, Reshma) (Filed on 11/22/2022)
November 22, 2022 Filing 31 JOINT STATUS REPORT filed by Devinder Chana. (Harman-Holmes, Ariel) (Filed on 11/22/2022)
October 13, 2022 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Jeffrey Pardo (Pardo, Matthew) (Filed on 10/13/2022)
October 13, 2022 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Christine J Haw (Haw, Christine) (Filed on 10/13/2022)
June 20, 2022 Filing 28 NOTICE by Devinder Chana of Disassociation of Counsel for Plaintiff (Dolin, Tionna) (Filed on 6/20/2022)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER FOR JURY TRIAL: Amended Pleadings due by 8/1/2022. Close of Fact Discovery due by 10/13/2022. Opening Reports due by 10/13/2022. Rebuttal Reports due by 11/3/2022. Close of Expert Discovery due by 11/24/2022. Dispositive Motion Hearing set for 1/5/2023, 01:30 PM, in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M Chen. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/21/2023, 02:30 PM, in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. Jury Selection set for 4/17/2023, 08:30 AM, in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M Chen. Jury Trial set for 4/17/2023, through 4/24/2023, 08:30 AM, in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M Chen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/7/2022. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A - Questionnaire)(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2022)
June 7, 2022 Filing 26 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edward M Chen: Status Conference held on 6/7/2022. Status Report due by 11/22/2022. Status Conference set for 11/29/2022, 02:30 PM, via Videoconference Only before Judge Edward M Chen.Total Time in Court: 7 minutes. Court Reporter: Elaine Cropper. Plaintiff Attorney: Ariel Harman-Holmes. Defendant Attorney: Jon Universal. Attachment: Minute Order. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/7/2022)
June 6, 2022 Filing 25 CLERK'S NOTICE PROVIDING ZOOM ACCESS FOR STATUS CONFERENCE ON 6/7/2022. Status Conference set for 6/7/2022, 02:30 PM, via Videoconference Only before Judge Edward M Chen. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/emcGeneral Order 58. Persons granted access to cou rt proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAF F) (Filed on 6/6/2022)
June 2, 2022 Filing 24 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel; and Proposed Order by James P. Mayo (Mayo, James) (Filed on 6/2/2022) Modified on 6/6/2022 (slh, COURT STAFF).
May 31, 2022 Filing 23 JOINT MEDIATION STATUS REPORT by Devinder Chana. (Harman-Holmes, Ariel) (Filed on 5/31/2022) Modified on 6/1/2022 (slh, COURT STAFF).
May 23, 2022 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Rabiya F. Tirmizi (Tirmizi, Rabiya) (Filed on 5/23/2022)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #20 Stipulation and Protective Order. (bxs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2022)
May 20, 2022 Filing 20 STIPULATION and [PROPOSED] PROTECTIVE ORDER - Confidential Designation Only filed by FCA US LLC. (Mayo, James) (Filed on 5/20/2022)
April 26, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Ariel S. Harman-Holmes (Harman-Holmes, Ariel) (Filed on 4/26/2022)
January 29, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE of Change of Address by Tionna Grace Dolin (Dolin, Tionna) (Filed on 1/29/2022)
January 28, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Change of Address by Tionna Grace Dolin (Dolin, Tionna) (Filed on 1/28/2022)
January 11, 2022 Filing 16 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edward M. Chen: Initial Case Management Conference held on 1/11/2022. Status Conference set for 6/7/2022 02:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Edward M. Chen. Joint Status Report due by 5/31/2022. Total Time in Court: 8 Minutes. Court Reporter: Katherine Sullivan. (vla, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/11/2022)
January 10, 2022 Filing 15 CLERKS NOTICE CONVERTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AT 01/11/2022 TO ZOOM HEARING. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/emcGeneral Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photogra phing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https ://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (vla, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2022)
January 7, 2022 Filing 14 AMENDED INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Devinder Chana. (Kuemerle, Karin) (Filed on 1/7/2022)
January 4, 2022 Filing 13 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Devinder Chana. (Kuemerle, Karin) (Filed on 1/4/2022)
January 4, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Karin Kuemerle (Kuemerle, Karin) (Filed on 1/4/2022)
December 21, 2021 Filing 11 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Universal, Jon) (Filed on 12/21/2021)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER IN REASSIGNED CASE: Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/11/2022 01:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/4/2022. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/28/2021. (afm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2021)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward M. Chen for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 10/25/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2021)
October 22, 2021 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (wft, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2021)
October 21, 2021 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by FCA US LLC.. (Mayo, James) (Filed on 10/21/2021)
October 12, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE by FCA US LLC of Notice of Order Setting Initial CMC and ADR Deadlines (Mayo, James) (Filed on 10/12/2021)
October 11, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by FCA US LLC (Attachments: #1 Notice to Adverse Party of Removal)(Mayo, James) (Filed on 10/11/2021)
October 8, 2021 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/4/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/11/2022 at 1:30 PM in Oakland - To be determined. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2021)
October 7, 2021 Answer to Removal Complaint (Refer to Docket [1-3], Page 68 of 101) filed by FCA US LLC, San Leandro Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2021)
October 7, 2021 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/21/2021. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2021)
October 7, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by FCA US LLC Re: Notice of Removal. (Mayo, James) (Filed on 10/7/2021)
October 7, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Alameda County Superior Court. Their case number is RG21090834. (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0971-16474695). Filed byFCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Interested Parties, #2 Declaration Jon D. Universal, #3 Declaration James P. Mayo, #4 Demand for Jury Trial, #5 Notice of Appearance of Jon D. Universal, #6 Notice of Appearance James P. Mayo, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mayo, James) (Filed on 10/7/2021)
October 7, 2021 #Electronic filing error. Please resubmit Civil Cover Sheet. Use October 2020 version which can be downloaded from https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/. No judge assignment will be made until the document is e-filed. Submit your document using Civil Events > Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover Sheet Re: #1 Notice of Removal,, filed by FCA US LLC (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chana v. FCA US LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Devinder Chana
Represented By: Tionna Grace Dolin
Represented By: Karin Kuemerle
Represented By: Ariel S. Harman-Holmes
Represented By: Rabiya F. Tirmizi
Represented By: Christine J Haw
Represented By: Matthew Jeffrey Pardo
Represented By: Daniel A. Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: James P. Mayo
Represented By: Jon David Universal
Represented By: Reshma Amarlal Bajaj
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Leandro Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram
Represented By: James P. Mayo
Represented By: Jon David Universal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?