Jones v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: David Robert Jones
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 3:2021cv08048
Filed: October 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2021 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of New York Northern; Case Number 6:21-cv-00982. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 7, 2021 Filing 4 JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order. Opposition period has expired with no objections filed. ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Northern District of California for inclusion into MDL-2741. Case to be assigned to the Hon. Vince Chhabria, U.S. District Judge. (amt)
September 1, 2021 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Rule 16 Conference by Telephone set for 11/30/2021 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 11/23/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (map)
September 1, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Monsanto Company. (map)
September 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Monsanto Company (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-5634446) filed by David Robert Jones. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(map)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Robert Jones
Represented By: James J. Bilsborrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?