Vogelgesang v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Plaintiff: Brian Vogelgesang
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 3:2021cv08510
Filed: November 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Sallie Kim
Referring Judge: William H Orrick
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER - Case Management Conference set for 2/1/2022 02:00 PM via Videoconference. Case Management Statement due by 1/25/2022. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 12/22/2021. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2021)
December 21, 2021 Filing 12 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint to Extend Time to Respond by Not More than 30 Days filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Ingram, Grant) (Filed on 12/21/2021)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William H. Orrick for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 12/21/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2021)
December 20, 2021 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2021)
December 20, 2021 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Life Insurance Company of North America.. (Ingram, Grant) (Filed on 12/20/2021)
December 15, 2021 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE CHANGING TIME OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTING HEARING BY ZOOM: The Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/31/2022 will now be held at 09:30 AM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/sk General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no docum ent associated with this entry.) (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2021)
November 5, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Brian Vogelgesang. Service waived by Life Insurance Company of North America waiver sent on 11/2/2021, answer due 1/1/2022. (Roberts, Michelle) (Filed on 11/5/2021)
November 3, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Life Insurance Company of North America. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2021)
November 3, 2021 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/24/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/31/2022 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2021)
November 3, 2021 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Brian Vogelgesang.. (Roberts, Michelle) (Filed on 11/3/2021)
November 2, 2021 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/16/2021. (mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2021)
November 2, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Roberts, Michelle) (Filed on 11/2/2021)
November 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of North America ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-16582215.). Filed byBrian Vogelgesang. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Roberts, Michelle) (Filed on 11/2/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vogelgesang v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Vogelgesang
Represented By: Michelle Lee Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Grant Edward Ingram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?