Mellor v. Hoffman et al
Plaintiff: Shauna Mellor
Defendant: Josh Hoffman, Enakshi Singh, Steven Chu, Jay T. Flatley, Christine M. Gorjanc, Travis Murdoch, Matthew A. Ocko, Sandra E. Peterson, Zach Serber, Rohit Sharma and Zymergen Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv08723
Filed: November 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: William H Orrick
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 77
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 2/1/2022 02:00 PM via Videoconference. Case Management Statement due by 1/25/2022. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 12/17/2021. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2021)
December 17, 2021 Filing 17 STIPULATION Regarding Extension of Time filed by Steven Chu, Jay T. Flatley, Christine M. Gorjanc, Josh Hoffman, Travis Murdoch, Matthew A. Ocko, Sandra E. Peterson, Zach Serber, Rohit Sharma, Enakshi Singh, Zymergen Inc.. (Muck, Kevin) (Filed on 12/17/2021)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William H. Orrick for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 12/14/21. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2021)
December 13, 2021 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2021)
December 10, 2021 Filing 14 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Steven Chu, Jay T. Flatley, Christine M. Gorjanc, Josh Hoffman, Travis Murdoch, Matthew A. Ocko, Sandra E. Peterson, Zach Serber, Rohit Sharma, Enakshi Singh, Zymergen Inc... (Muck, Kevin) (Filed on 12/10/2021)
November 29, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa McCall (McCall, Melissa) (Filed on 11/29/2021)
November 29, 2021 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 12/13/2021. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 12/13/2021. (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2021)
November 23, 2021 Filing 11 STIPULATION Regarding Waiver of Service and Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Steven Chu, Jay T. Flatley, Christine M. Gorjanc, Josh Hoffman, Travis Murdoch, Matthew A. Ocko, Sandra E. Peterson, Zach Serber, Rohit Sharma, Enakshi Singh, Zymergen Inc.. (Muck, Kevin) (Filed on 11/23/2021)
November 23, 2021 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Zymergen Inc. identifying Corporate Parent No Corporate Parent and No Publicly Held Corporation Owns 10% or More of Its Stock for Zymergen Inc.. and Certification of Interested Entities or Persons (Muck, Kevin) (Filed on 11/23/2021)
November 23, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Peter Muck (Muck, Kevin) (Filed on 11/23/2021)
November 23, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Susan Samuels Muck (Muck, Susan) (Filed on 11/23/2021)
November 15, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shauna Mellor. Zymergen Inc. served on 11/11/2021, answer due 12/2/2021. (Rosen, Laurence) (Filed on 11/15/2021)
November 10, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Steven Chu, Jay T. Flatley, Christine M. Gorjanc, Josh Hoffman, Travis Murdoch, Matthew A. Ocko, Sandra E. Peterson, Zach Serber, Rohit Sharma, Enakshi Singh, Zymergen Inc. (sfb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2021)
November 10, 2021 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/31/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/7/2022 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (sfb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2021)
November 9, 2021 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/23/2021. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2021)
November 9, 2021 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Shauna Mellor (Rosen, Laurence) (Filed on 11/9/2021)
November 9, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Rosen, Laurence) (Filed on 11/9/2021)
November 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Steven Chu, Jay T. Flatley, Christine M. Gorjanc, Josh Hoffman, Travis Murdoch, Matthew A. Ocko, Sandra E. Peterson, Zach Serber, Rohit Sharma, Enakshi Singh, Zymergen Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-16611685.). Filed byShauna Mellor. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rosen, Laurence) (Filed on 11/9/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mellor v. Hoffman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shauna Mellor
Represented By: Laurence Matthew Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josh Hoffman
Represented By: Alison Clare Jordan
Represented By: Kevin Peter Muck
Represented By: Melissa McCall
Represented By: Susan Samuels Muck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enakshi Singh
Represented By: Alison Clare Jordan
Represented By: Kevin Peter Muck
Represented By: Melissa McCall
Represented By: Susan Samuels Muck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Chu
Represented By: Alison Clare Jordan
Represented By: Kevin Peter Muck
Represented By: Melissa McCall
Represented By: Susan Samuels Muck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay T. Flatley
Represented By: Alison Clare Jordan
Represented By: Kevin Peter Muck
Represented By: Melissa McCall
Represented By: Susan Samuels Muck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine M. Gorjanc
Represented By: Alison Clare Jordan
Represented By: Kevin Peter Muck
Represented By: Melissa McCall
Represented By: Susan Samuels Muck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travis Murdoch
Represented By: Alison Clare Jordan
Represented By: Kevin Peter Muck
Represented By: Melissa McCall
Represented By: Susan Samuels Muck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew A. Ocko
Represented By: Alison Clare Jordan
Represented By: Kevin Peter Muck
Represented By: Melissa McCall
Represented By: Susan Samuels Muck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra E. Peterson
Represented By: Alison Clare Jordan
Represented By: Kevin Peter Muck
Represented By: Melissa McCall
Represented By: Susan Samuels Muck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zach Serber
Represented By: Alison Clare Jordan
Represented By: Kevin Peter Muck
Represented By: Melissa McCall
Represented By: Susan Samuels Muck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rohit Sharma
Represented By: Alison Clare Jordan
Represented By: Kevin Peter Muck
Represented By: Melissa McCall
Represented By: Susan Samuels Muck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zymergen Inc.
Represented By: Alison Clare Jordan
Represented By: Kevin Peter Muck
Represented By: Melissa McCall
Represented By: Susan Samuels Muck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?