IBEW Local 353 Pension Plan v. Eargo, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: IBEW Local 353 Pension Plan
Defendant: Eargo, Inc., Christian Gormsen, Adam Laponis, Josh Makower, Juliet Bakker, Peter Tuxen Bisgaard, Doug Hughes, Geoff Pardo, Nina Richardson, A. Brooke Seawell, David Wu, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, BofA Securities, Inc., Wells Fargo Securities, LLC and William Blair & Company, L.L.C.
Petitioner: Xiaobin Cai
Case Number: 3:2021cv08747
Filed: November 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles R Breyer
Referring Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 77
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION AND ORDER APPOINTING IBEW LOCAL 353 PENSION PLAN AND XIAOBIN CAI AS LEAD PLAINTIFF, APPROVING THEIR SELECTION OF LEAD COUNSEL, AND CONSOLIDATING ACTIONS by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting (35) Stipulation in case 3:21-cv-08597-CRB. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2022)
December 17, 2021 Filing 22 Case Reassigned to Judge Charles R. Breyer. Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2021)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER RELATING CASE. The following cases are related: C21-8597 CRB and C21-8747 HSG. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/16/2021. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2021)
December 14, 2021 Filing 20 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 3:21-cv-8597-CRB. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 12/14/2021. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2021)
December 6, 2021 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE of Counsel of Scott R. Foglietta by Jonathan Daniel Uslaner on behalf of IBEW Local 353 Pension Plan (Uslaner, Jonathan) (Filed on 12/6/2021)
December 6, 2021 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE of Counsel of Avi Josefson by Jonathan Daniel Uslaner on behalf of IBEW Local 353 Pension Plan (Uslaner, Jonathan) (Filed on 12/6/2021)
December 6, 2021 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE of Counsel of Hannah Ross by Jonathan Daniel Uslaner on behalf of IBEW Local 353 Pension Plan (Uslaner, Jonathan) (Filed on 12/6/2021)
December 6, 2021 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of Counsel of John Rizio-Hamilton by Jonathan Daniel Uslaner on behalf of IBEW Local 353 Pension Plan (Uslaner, Jonathan) (Filed on 12/6/2021)
December 6, 2021 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of Counsel of Jonathan D. Uslaner by Jonathan Daniel Uslaner on behalf of IBEW Local 353 Pension Plan (Uslaner, Jonathan) (Filed on 12/6/2021)
December 6, 2021 Filing 14 Certificate of Interested Entities by IBEW Local 353 Pension Plan (Uslaner, Jonathan) (Filed on 12/6/2021)
December 6, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by IBEW Local 353 Pension Plan. Motion Hearing set for 1/11/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, - To be determined before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 12/20/2021. Replies due by 12/27/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jonathan D. Uslaner, #2 Exhibit A - Certification, #3 Exhibit B - Loss Chart, #4 Exhibit C - Notice of Pendency of Local 353 Action, #5 Exhibit D - Bernstein Litowitz Resume, #6 Exhibit E - Symantec Order, #7 Exhibit F - Exxon Order, #8 Exhibit G - James River Order, #9 Proposed Order)(Uslaner, Jonathan) (Filed on 12/6/2021)
December 6, 2021 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #9 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel by Jacob Allen Walker on behalf of Xiaobin Cai (Walker, Jacob) (Filed on 12/6/2021)
December 6, 2021 Filing 11 Certificate of Interested Entities by Xiaobin Cai re #9 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel (Walker, Jacob) (Filed on 12/6/2021)
December 6, 2021 Filing 10 Declaration of Jacob A. Walker in Support of #9 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed byXiaobin Cai. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #9 ) (Walker, Jacob) (Filed on 12/6/2021)
December 6, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by Xiaobin Cai. Motion Hearing set for 1/10/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 12/20/2021. Replies due by 12/27/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Walker, Jacob) (Filed on 12/6/2021)
November 22, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Publication by IBEW Local 353 Pension Plan (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - IBEW Local 353 PSLRA Notice, #2 Exhibit B - Fazio PSLRA Notice) (Uslaner, Jonathan) (Filed on 11/22/2021) Modified on 11/23/2021 (gba, COURT STAFF).
November 12, 2021 Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/1/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/8/2022 at 2:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor. Correcting date of Case Management Conference. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2021)
November 12, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Juliet Bakker, BofA Securities, Inc., Eargo, Inc., Christian Gormsen, Doug Hughes, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Adam Laponis, Josh Makower, Geoff Pardo, Nina Richardson, A. Brooke Seawell, Peter Tuxen Bisgaard. (kmg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2021)
November 12, 2021 Filing 5 FILED IN ERROR. SEE DOCKET #7 .Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/1/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/1/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor. (kmg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2021) Modified on 11/15/2021 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
November 10, 2021 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2021)
November 10, 2021 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by IBEW Local 353 Pension Plan (Uslaner, Jonathan) (Filed on 11/10/2021)
November 10, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Uslaner, Jonathan) (Filed on 11/10/2021)
November 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Juliet Bakker, BofA Securities, Inc., Eargo, Inc., Christian Gormsen, Doug Hughes, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Adam Laponis, Josh Makower, Geoff Pardo, Nina Richardson, A. Brooke Seawell, Peter Tuxen Bisgaard, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, William Blair & Company, L.L.C., David Wu ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-16616184.). Filed byIBEW Local 353 Pension Plan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Uslaner, Jonathan) (Filed on 11/10/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IBEW Local 353 Pension Plan v. Eargo, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IBEW Local 353 Pension Plan
Represented By: Jonathan Daniel Uslaner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eargo, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christian Gormsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Laponis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josh Makower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juliet Bakker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Tuxen Bisgaard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doug Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geoff Pardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nina Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Brooke Seawell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Securities LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BofA Securities, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Securities, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Blair & Company, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Xiaobin Cai
Represented By: Jacob Allen Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?