Apple Inc. v. NSO Group Technologies Limited et al
Plaintiff: Apple Inc.
Defendant: NSO Group Technologies Limited and Q Cyber Technologies Limited
Case Number: 3:2021cv09078
Filed: November 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Referring Judge: James Donato
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph N. Akrotirianakis (Akrotirianakis, Joseph) (Filed on 1/5/2022)
January 4, 2022 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Apple Inc.. Service waived by NSO Group Technologies Limited waiver sent on 12/3/2021, answer due 3/3/2022; Q Cyber Technologies Limited waiver sent on 12/3/2021, answer due 3/3/2022. (Bowker, David) (Filed on 1/4/2022)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/17/2022 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 2/10/2022.. Signed by Judge James Donato on 12/2/2021. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2021)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge James Donato for all further proceedings. Judge Maxine M. Chesney no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 12/1/21. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2021)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 1, 2021. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2021)
November 30, 2021 Filing 13 Case reassigned to Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Judge Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins no Longer assigned to the case. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2021)
November 30, 2021 Filing 12 This case will be randomly reassigned to a District Judge outside the San Jose Division pursuant to the Caseload Rebalancing Pilot Program approved by the Court effective March 1, 2018. For information, visit our web page at #http://cand.uscourts.gov/news/225. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2021)
November 30, 2021 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2021)
November 30, 2021 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Apple Inc... (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 11/30/2021)
November 24, 2021 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to NSO Group Technologies Limited, Q Cyber Technologies Limited. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2021)
November 24, 2021 Filing 8 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/16/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/23/2022 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2021)
November 23, 2021 Filing 7 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/7/2021. (mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2021)
November 23, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Molly M. Jennings, ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-16654498.) filed by Apple Inc.. (Jennings, Molly) (Filed on 11/23/2021)
November 23, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by David W. Bowker on behalf of Apple Inc., (Bowker, David) (Filed on 11/23/2021)
November 23, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Albond Powell on behalf of Apple Inc., (Powell, Benjamin) (Filed on 11/23/2021)
November 23, 2021 Filing 3 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Apple Inc. identifying Corporate Parent No Corporate Parent and No Publicly Held Corporation Owns 10% or More of Its Stock for Apple Inc.. (and Certification of Interested Entities or Persons Pursuant to L.R. 3-15) (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 11/23/2021)
November 23, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 11/23/2021)
November 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NSO Group Technologies Limited, Q Cyber Technologies Limited ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-16654283.). Filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 11/23/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Apple Inc. v. NSO Group Technologies Limited et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Apple Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin Albond Powell
Represented By: David W. Bowker
Represented By: Molly Maureen Jennings
Represented By: Sonal N. Mehta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NSO Group Technologies Limited
Represented By: Joseph N. Akrotirianakis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Q Cyber Technologies Limited
Represented By: Joseph N. Akrotirianakis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?