St Martinville et al v. McKinsey & Co Inc
Plaintiff: City of St Martinville, Coushatta Tribe of Louisiana, Phillip Terrell and Police Jury Rapides Parish
Defendant: McKinsey & Co Inc
Case Number: 3:2021cv09100
Filed: November 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles R Breyer
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2021 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Western; Case Number 6:21-cv-03832. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
November 29, 2021 MEMBER CASE OPENED re MDL 2996: Louisiana Western, 6:21-cv-03832, St Martinville et al v. McKinsey & Co Inc has been opened in California Northern District as 3:21-cv-09100-CRB St Martinville et al v. McKinsey & Co Inc pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 15 cc: JPMDL (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2021)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER FOR MULTI-DISTRICT LITIGATION TRANSFER CTO # 15, directing transfer to Northern District of California, In Re: McKinsey & Company, Inc., National Prescription Opiate Consultant Litigation, MDL # 2996. Record electronically transmitted to receiving court. Case Terminated. All future pleadings should be filed with the newly assigned court. (crt,Reeves, T)
November 23, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE received via email from Clerk of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transmitting Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-15) in MDL No.2996, IN RE: McKinsey & Company, Inc., National Prescription Opiate Consultant Litigation advising case shall be transferred to the Northern District of California upon request of the record. (crt,Reeves, T)
November 2, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to McKinsey & Co Inc. (crt,Miletello, A)
November 1, 2021 CASE Assigned to Judge Robert R Summerhays and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Miletello, A)
November 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against McKinsey & Co Inc with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4879071) filed by City of St Martinville, Coushatta Tribe of Louisiana, Policy Jury Rapides Parish, Phillip Terrell. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney J Burton LeBlanc, IV added to party City of St Martinville(pty:pla))(aty,LeBlanc, J) Modified docket text on 11/2/2021 (Miletello, A).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: St Martinville et al v. McKinsey & Co Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of St Martinville
Represented By: J Burton LeBlanc, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coushatta Tribe of Louisiana
Represented By: J Burton LeBlanc, IV
Represented By: Christopher M Sylvia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Terrell
Represented By: J Burton LeBlanc, IV
Represented By: W Jay Luneau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Police Jury Rapides Parish
Represented By: J Burton LeBlanc, IV
Represented By: W Jay Luneau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKinsey & Co Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?