Adams County Board of County Commissioners et al v. McKinsey and Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: Adams County Board of County Commissioners, Athens County Board of County Commissioners, Belmont County Board of County Commissioners, Brown County Board of County Commissioners, Champaign County Board of County Commissioners, City of Cincinnati, Ohio, City of Fairfield, Ohio, City of Hamilton, Ohio, City of Ironton, Ohio, City of Lebanon, Ohio, City of Middletown, Ohio, City of Portsmouth, Ohio, Clermont County Board Of County Commissioners, Coshocton County Board of County Commissioners, Darke County Board of County Commissioners, Delaware County Board of County Commissioners, Fairfield County Board of County Commissioners, Franklin County Board of County Commissioners, Gallia County Board of County Commissioners, Guernsey County Board of County Commissioners, Hamilton County Board of County Commissioners, Hocking County Board of County Commissioners, Jackson County Board of County Commmissioners, Knox County Board of County Commissioners, Lawrence County Board of County Commissioners, Licking County Board of County Commissioners, Logan County Board of County Commissioners, Monroe County Board of County Commissioners, Morrow County Board of County Commissioners, Muskingum County Board of County Commissioners, Perry County Board of County Commissioners, Pike County Board of County Commissioners, Ross County Board of County Commmissioners, Scioto County Board of County Commissioners, Seneca County Board of County Commissioners, Shelby County Board of County Commissioners and Vinton County Board of County Commissioners
Defendant: McKinsey and Company, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv09107
Filed: November 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles R Breyer
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2021 Filing 4 ERRATA CORRECTED COMPLAINT by Adams County Board of County Commissioners, Athens County Board of County Commissioners, Belmont County Board of County Commissioners, Brown County Board of County Commissioners, Champaign County Board of County Commissioners, City of Cincinnati, Ohio, City of Fairfield, Ohio, City of Hamilton, Ohio, City of Ironton, Ohio, City of Lebanon, Ohio, City of Middletown, Ohio, City of Portsmouth, Ohio, Clermont County Board Of County Commissioners, Coshocton County Board of County Commissioners, Darke County Board of County Commissioners, Delaware County Board of County Commissioners, Fairfield County Board of County Commissioners, Franklin County Board of County Commissioners, Gallia County Board of County Commissioners, Guernsey County Board of County Commissioners, Hamilton County Board of County Commissioners, Hocking County Board of County Commissioners, Jackson County Board of County Commmissioners, Knox County Board of County Commissioners, Lawrence County Board of County Commissioners, Licking County Board of County Commissioners, Logan County Board of County Commissioners, Monroe County Board of County Commissioners, Morrow County Board of County Commissioners, Muskingum County Board of County Commissioners, Perry County Board of County Commissioners, Pike County Board of County Commissioners, Ross County Board of County Commmissioners, Scioto County Board of County Commissioners, Seneca County Board of County Commissioners, Shelby County Board of County Commissioners, Vinton County Board of County Commissioners. (Attachments: #1 Errata Corrected Complaint)(Pifko, Mark) (Filed on 12/22/2021)
November 29, 2021 Filing 3 Case transferred in from District of Ohio Southern; Case Number 2:21-cv-05217. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
November 29, 2021 MEMBER CASE OPENED re MDL 2996. Case from Ohio Southern, 2:21cv05217, Adams County Board of County Commissioners et al v. McKinsey and Company, Inc. have been opened in California Northern District as 3:21-cv-09107-CRB Adams County Board of County Commissioners et al v. McKinsey and Company, Inc. pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 15 cc: JPMDL (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2021)
November 23, 2021 Filing 2 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO 15) - Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Northern District of California for the reasons stated in the order of June 7, 2021, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Charles R. Breyer (pb)
November 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8579225), filed by Ross County Board of County Commmissioners, Pike County Board of County Commissioners, Hamilton County Board of County Commissioners, City of Fairfield, Ohio, Licking County Board of County Commissioners, Fairfield County Board of County Commissioners, Athens County Board of County Commissioners, Adams County Board of County Commissioners, Franklin County Board of County Commissioners, Muskingum County Board of County Commissioners, Delaware County Board of County Commissioners, Logan County Board of County Commissioners, Lawrence County Board of County Commissioners, Monroe County Board of County Commissioners, Guernsey County Board of County Commissioners, Coshocton County Board of County Commissioners, Knox County Board of County Commissioners, City of Lebanon, Ohio, Perry County Board of County Commissioners, Seneca County Board of County Commissioners, City of Middletown, Ohio, Hocking County Board of County Commissioners, Clermont County Board Of County Commissioners, Jackson County Board of County Commmissioners, Morrow County Board of County Commissioners, City of Cincinnati, Ohio, Shelby County Board of County Commissioners, Belmont County Board of County Commissioners, City of Ironton, Ohio, City of Portsmouth, Ohio, Darke County Board of County Commissioners, City of Hamilton, Ohio, Brown County Board of County Commissioners, Scioto County Board of County Commissioners, Vinton County Board of County Commissioners, Gallia County Board of County Commissioners, Champaign County Board of County Commissioners. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet CCS with Plf Attorney List) (Peterson, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adams County Board of County Commissioners et al v. McKinsey and Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adams County Board of County Commissioners
Represented By: James Charles Peterson
Represented By: John A Lancione
Represented By: Michael Jay Fuller, Jr
Represented By: Paul T. Farrell, Jr.
Represented By: Mark Philip Pifko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Athens County Board of County Commissioners
Represented By: James Charles Peterson
Represented By: Michael Jay Fuller, Jr
Represented By: Paul T. Farrell, Jr.
Represented By: Mark Philip Pifko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Belmont County Board of County Commissioners
Represented By: James Charles Peterson
Represented By: John A Lancione
Represented By: Michael Jay Fuller, Jr
Represented By: Paul T. Farrell, Jr.
Represented By: Mark Philip Pifko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brown County Board of County Commissioners
Represented By: James Charles Peterson
Represented By: John A Lancione
Represented By: Michael Jay Fuller, Jr
Represented By: Paul T. Farrell, Jr.
Represented By: Mark Philip Pifko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Champaign County Board of County Commissioners
Represented By: James Charles Peterson
Represented By: Michael Jay Fuller, Jr
Represented By: Paul T. Farrell, Jr.
Represented By: Mark Philip Pifko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Cincinnati, Ohio
Represented By: James Charles Peterson
Represented By: Michael Jay Fuller, Jr
Represented By: Paul T. Farrell, Jr.
Represented By: Mark Philip Pifko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Fairfield, Ohio
Represented By: James Charles Peterson
Represented By: David Dale Seif, Jr., Jr.
Represented By: Michael Jay Fuller, Jr
Represented By: Paul T. Farrell, Jr.
Represented By: Rebecca D. Louks
Represented By: Robert R Miller
Represented By: Mark Philip Pifko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Hamilton, Ohio
Represented By: James Charles Peterson
Represented By: David Dale Seif, Jr., Jr.
Represented By: Michael Jay Fuller, Jr
Represented By: Paul T. Farrell, Jr.
Represented By: Rebecca D. Louks
Represented By: Robert R Miller
Represented By: Mark Philip Pifko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Ironton, Ohio
Represented By: James Charles Peterson
Represented By: David Dale Seif, Jr., Jr.
Represented By: Michael Jay Fuller, Jr
Represented By: Paul T. Farrell, Jr.
Represented By: Rebecca D. Louks
Represented By: Robert R Miller
Represented By: Mark Philip Pifko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Lebanon, Ohio
Represented By: James Charles Peterson
Represented By: Michael Jay Fuller, Jr
Represented By: Paul T. Farrell, Jr.
Represented By: Mark Philip Pifko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Middletown, Ohio
Represented By: James Charles Peterson
Represented By: David Dale Seif, Jr., Jr.
Represented By: Michael Jay Fuller, Jr
Represented By: Paul T. Farrell, Jr.
Represented By: Rebecca D. Louks
Represented By: Robert R Miller
Represented By: Mark Philip Pifko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Portsmouth, Ohio
Represented By: James Charles Peterson
Represented By: John A Lancione
Represented By: Michael Jay Fuller, Jr
Represented By: Paul T. Farrell, Jr.
Represented By: Mark Philip Pifko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clermont County Board Of County Commissioners
Represented By: James Charles Peterson
Represented By: John A Lancione
Represented By: Michael Jay Fuller, Jr
Represented By: Paul T. Farrell, Jr.
Represented By: Mark Philip Pifko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coshocton County Board of County Commissioners
Represented By: James Charles Peterson
Represented By: David Dale Seif, Jr., Jr.
Represented By: Michael Jay Fuller, Jr
Represented By: Paul T. Farrell, Jr.
Represented By: Rebecca D. Louks
Represented By: Robert R Miller
Represented By: Mark Philip Pifko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darke County Board of County Commissioners
Represented By: James Charles Peterson
Represented By: David Dale Seif, Jr., Jr.
Represented By: Michael Jay Fuller, Jr
Represented By: Paul T. Farrell, Jr.
Represented By: Rebecca D. Louks
Represented By: Robert R Miller
Represented By: Mark Philip Pifko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delaware County Board of County Commissioners
Represented By: James Charles Peterson
Represented By: Michael Jay Fuller, Jr
Represented By: Paul T. Farrell, Jr.
Represented By: Mark Philip Pifko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fairfield County Board of County Commissioners
Represented By: James Charles Peterson
Represented By: David Dale Seif, Jr., Jr.
Represented By: Michael Jay Fuller, Jr
Represented By: Paul T. Farrell, Jr.
Represented By: Rebecca D. Louks
Represented By: Robert R Miller
Represented By: Mark Philip Pifko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Franklin County Board of County Commissioners
Represented By: James Charles Peterson
Represented By: Michael Jay Fuller, Jr
Represented By: Paul T. Farrell, Jr.
Represented By: Mark Philip Pifko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gallia County Board of County Commissioners
Represented By: James Charles Peterson
Represented By: David Dale Seif, Jr., Jr.
Represented By: Michael Jay Fuller, Jr
Represented By: Paul T. Farrell, Jr.
Represented By: Rebecca D. Louks
Represented By: Robert R Miller
Represented By: Mark Philip Pifko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guernsey County Board of County Commissioners
Represented By: James Charles Peterson
Represented By: David Dale Seif, Jr., Jr.
Represented By: Michael Jay Fuller, Jr
Represented By: Paul T. Farrell, Jr.
Represented By: Rebecca D. Louks
Represented By: Robert R Miller
Represented By: Mark Philip Pifko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hamilton County Board of County Commissioners
Represented By: James Charles Peterson
Represented By: David Dale Seif, Jr., Jr.
Represented By: Michael Jay Fuller, Jr
Represented By: Paul T. Farrell, Jr.
Represented By: Rebecca D. Louks
Represented By: Robert R Miller
Represented By: Mark Philip Pifko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hocking County Board of County Commissioners
Represented By: James Charles Peterson
Represented By: David Dale Seif, Jr., Jr.
Represented By: Michael Jay Fuller, Jr
Represented By: Paul T. Farrell, Jr.
Represented By: Rebecca D. Louks
Represented By: Robert R Miller
Represented By: Mark Philip Pifko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jackson County Board of County Commmissioners
Represented By: James Charles Peterson
Represented By: David Dale Seif, Jr., Jr.
Represented By: Michael Jay Fuller, Jr
Represented By: Rebecca D. Louks
Represented By: Robert R Miller
Represented By: Mark Philip Pifko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Knox County Board of County Commissioners
Represented By: James Charles Peterson
Represented By: David Dale Seif, Jr., Jr.
Represented By: Michael Jay Fuller, Jr
Represented By: Paul T. Farrell, Jr.
Represented By: Rebecca D. Louks
Represented By: Robert R Miller
Represented By: Mark Philip Pifko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence County Board of County Commissioners
Represented By: James Charles Peterson
Represented By: David Dale Seif, Jr., Jr.
Represented By: Michael Jay Fuller, Jr
Represented By: Paul T. Farrell, Jr.
Represented By: Rebecca D. Louks
Represented By: Robert R Miller
Represented By: Mark Philip Pifko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Licking County Board of County Commissioners
Represented By: James Charles Peterson
Represented By: David Dale Seif, Jr., Jr.
Represented By: Michael Jay Fuller, Jr
Represented By: Paul T. Farrell, Jr.
Represented By: Rebecca D. Louks
Represented By: Robert R Miller
Represented By: Mark Philip Pifko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Logan County Board of County Commissioners
Represented By: James Charles Peterson
Represented By: David Dale Seif, Jr., Jr.
Represented By: Michael Jay Fuller, Jr
Represented By: Paul T. Farrell, Jr.
Represented By: Rebecca D. Louks
Represented By: Robert R Miller
Represented By: Mark Philip Pifko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monroe County Board of County Commissioners
Represented By: James Charles Peterson
Represented By: David Dale Seif, Jr., Jr.
Represented By: Michael Jay Fuller, Jr
Represented By: Rebecca D. Louks
Represented By: Robert R Miller
Represented By: Mark Philip Pifko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Morrow County Board of County Commissioners
Represented By: James Charles Peterson
Represented By: David Dale Seif, Jr., Jr.
Represented By: Michael Jay Fuller, Jr
Represented By: Paul T. Farrell, Jr.
Represented By: Mark Philip Pifko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Muskingum County Board of County Commissioners
Represented By: James Charles Peterson
Represented By: David Dale Seif, Jr., Jr.
Represented By: Michael Jay Fuller, Jr
Represented By: Paul T. Farrell, Jr.
Represented By: Rebecca D. Louks
Represented By: Robert R Miller
Represented By: Mark Philip Pifko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Perry County Board of County Commissioners
Represented By: James Charles Peterson
Represented By: David Dale Seif, Jr., Jr.
Represented By: Michael Jay Fuller, Jr
Represented By: Paul T. Farrell, Jr.
Represented By: Rebecca D. Louks
Represented By: Robert R Miller
Represented By: Mark Philip Pifko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pike County Board of County Commissioners
Represented By: James Charles Peterson
Represented By: David Dale Seif, Jr., Jr.
Represented By: Michael Jay Fuller, Jr
Represented By: Paul T. Farrell, Jr.
Represented By: Rebecca D. Louks
Represented By: Robert R Miller
Represented By: Mark Philip Pifko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ross County Board of County Commmissioners
Represented By: James Charles Peterson
Represented By: David Dale Seif, Jr., Jr.
Represented By: Michael Jay Fuller, Jr
Represented By: Paul T. Farrell, Jr.
Represented By: Rebecca D. Louks
Represented By: Robert R Miller
Represented By: Mark Philip Pifko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scioto County Board of County Commissioners
Represented By: James Charles Peterson
Represented By: John A Lancione
Represented By: Michael Jay Fuller, Jr
Represented By: Paul T. Farrell, Jr.
Represented By: Mark Philip Pifko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seneca County Board of County Commissioners
Represented By: James Charles Peterson
Represented By: David Dale Seif, Jr., Jr.
Represented By: Michael Jay Fuller, Jr
Represented By: Paul T. Farrell, Jr.
Represented By: Rebecca D. Louks
Represented By: Robert R Miller
Represented By: Mark Philip Pifko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelby County Board of County Commissioners
Represented By: James Charles Peterson
Represented By: David Dale Seif, Jr., Jr.
Represented By: Michael Jay Fuller, Jr
Represented By: Paul T. Farrell, Jr.
Represented By: Rebecca D. Louks
Represented By: Robert R Miller
Represented By: Mark Philip Pifko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vinton County Board of County Commissioners
Represented By: James Charles Peterson
Represented By: David Dale Seif, Jr., Jr.
Represented By: Michael Jay Fuller, Jr
Represented By: Paul T. Farrell, Jr.
Represented By: Rebecca D. Louks
Represented By: Robert R Miller
Represented By: Mark Philip Pifko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKinsey and Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?