Floyd County, KY v. McKinsey & Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: Floyd County, KY
Defendant: McKinsey & Company Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv09108
Filed: November 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles R Breyer
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2021 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of Kentucky Eastern; Case Number 7:21-cv-00091. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
November 24, 2021 MEMBER CASE OPENED: re: MDL 2996: Eastern Kentucky, 7:21-cv-91 DLB, Floyd County, KY v. McKinsey & Company, Inc., Opened in California Northern District as 21-cv-9108 CRB pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order CTO 15 cc: JPMDL (lsk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2021)
November 23, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFIED ORDER received from Northern District of California re: Case Transfer to the MDL Panel pursuant to CTO No. 15 filed in MDL Case Number 2996. (TDA) cc: COR, NDCA
November 23, 2021 Filing 6 INFORMATION COPY OF MDL CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-15) re MDL No. 2996: transferred to Northern District of California. (TDA)
November 9, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF FILING by McKinsey & Company, Inc. re #4 MOTION to Stay by McKinsey & Company, Inc. Proposed Order Defendant's Motion for a Stay of Proceedings (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lockaby, Amanda)
November 9, 2021 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Bunning for review: re #4 MOTION to Stay by McKinsey & Company, Inc. Proceedings Pending Resolution of Defandant's Motion to Transfer for Consolidated Pretrial Proceedings Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 (RCB)
November 9, 2021 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY TO Amanda Lockaby re #4 MOTION to Stay by McKinsey & Company, Inc.; Error: attorney failed to submit a [proposed order] as an electronic attachment to the motion. Entry by attorney; within 7 calendar days, prepare a document entitled "Notice of Filing", file the Notice using the event "Notice of Filing," attach the proposed order, and create a link to the related docket entry. cc: COR (RCB)
November 8, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Stay by McKinsey & Company, Inc. Proceedings Pending Resolution of Defandant's Motion to Transfer for Consolidated Pretrial Proceedings Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit JPML Transfer Order dated 6/7/2021)(Lockaby, Amanda) Modified text on 11/9/2021 (RCB). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/9/2021: #2 Proposed Order) (RCB).
November 4, 2021 Filing 3 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by McKinsey & Company, Inc. (TDA)
November 4, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Floyd Circuit Court, case number 21-CI-00526. (Filing fee $402; receipt number AKYEDC-5117304), filed by McKinsey & Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 State Court Record, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (TDA)
November 4, 2021 CLERK'S NOTE re #1 Notice of Removal: MDL Panel & S. Vrolijk were notified via email with a copy of the Notice of Removal and Docket Sheet. (TDA)
November 4, 2021 Conflict Check run. (TDA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Floyd County, KY v. McKinsey & Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Floyd County, KY
Represented By: Gary C. Johnson
Represented By: Joseph L. Ciaccio
Represented By: Leslie M. Cronen
Represented By: Salvatore C. Badala
Represented By: Shayna E. Sacks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKinsey & Company Inc.
Represented By: Amanda McFarland Lockaby
Represented By: Kara MacCartie Stewart
Represented By: Linsey W. West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?