Ashland County Board of County Commissioners et al v. McKinsey and Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: Ashland County Board of County Commissioners, Auglaize County Board of County Commissioners, Carroll County Board of County Commissioners, City of Ashland, OH, City of Cleveland, Ohio, Columbiana County Board of County Commissioners, Crawford County Board of County Commissioners, Erie County Board of County Commissioners, Geauga County Board of County Commissioners, Huron County Board of County Commissioners, Marion County Board of County Commissioners, Mercer County Board of County Commissioners, Ottawa County Board of County Commissioners, Wayne County Board of County Commissioners, Williams County Board of County Commissioners and Wyandot County Board of County Commissioners
Defendant: McKinsey and Company, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv09219
Filed: November 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles R Breyer
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2021 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Ohio Northern; Case Number 1:21-cv-02086. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
November 29, 2021 MEMBER CASE OPENED re MDL 2996. Case from Ohio Northern, 1:21-cv-02086, Ashland County Board of County Commissioners et al v. McKinsey and Company, Inc., Opened in California Northern District as 3:21-cv-09219-CRB Ashland County Board of County Commissioners et al v. McKinsey and Company, Inc. pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 15 cc: JPMDL (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2021)
November 24, 2021 Filing 4 Conditional Transfer Order by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. In re: MDL 2996 McKinsey & Company, Inc., National Prescription Opiate Consultant Litigation. Case transferred to the Northern District of California and assigned to the Honorable Charles R. Breyer.(P,R)
November 5, 2021 Filing 2 Supplement to Complaint - Civil Cover Sheet, filed by All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) #1 . (Peterson, James)
November 4, 2021 Filing 3 Magistrate Consent Form issued. Summons not provided, and were not issued. (L,MI)
November 4, 2021 Judge Pamela A. Barker assigned to case. (L,MI)
November 4, 2021 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (L,MI)
November 4, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-11117940. Filed by Marion County Board of County Commissioners, Crawford County Board of County Commissioners, Auglaize County Board of County Commissioners, Ashland County Board of County Commissioners, Wyandot County Board of County Commissioners, Ottawa County Board of County Commissioners, Columbiana County Board of County Commissioners, Carroll County Board of County Commissioners, Geauga County Board of County Commissioners, Mercer County Board of County Commissioners, Wayne County Board of County Commissioners, Williams County Board of County Commissioners, Erie County Board of County Commissioners, City of Ashland, OH, Huron County Board of County Commissioners, City of Cleveland, Ohio. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet with Plaintiff's Attorney List). (Peterson, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ashland County Board of County Commissioners et al v. McKinsey and Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashland County Board of County Commissioners
Represented By: Anthony J. Majestro
Represented By: Christine C. Mansour
Represented By: J Burton LeBlanc, IV
Represented By: John A Lancione
Represented By: Mark P Pifko
Represented By: Michael Jay Fuller, Jr
Represented By: Michael P. McNamee
Represented By: Paul T. Farrell, Jr.
Represented By: Peter J. Mougey
Represented By: Peter H. Weinberger
Represented By: Rebecca D. Louks
Represented By: Robert R Miller
Represented By: Russell W. Budd
Represented By: William Hawal
Represented By: James C. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Auglaize County Board of County Commissioners
Represented By: Anthony J. Majestro
Represented By: Christine C. Mansour
Represented By: J Burton LeBlanc, IV
Represented By: John A Lancione
Represented By: Mark P Pifko
Represented By: Michael Jay Fuller, Jr
Represented By: Michael P. McNamee
Represented By: Paul T. Farrell, Jr.
Represented By: Peter J. Mougey
Represented By: Peter H. Weinberger
Represented By: Rebecca D. Louks
Represented By: Robert R Miller
Represented By: Russell W. Budd
Represented By: William Hawal
Represented By: James C. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carroll County Board of County Commissioners
Represented By: Anthony J. Majestro
Represented By: Christine C. Mansour
Represented By: J Burton LeBlanc, IV
Represented By: John A Lancione
Represented By: Mark P Pifko
Represented By: Michael Jay Fuller, Jr
Represented By: Michael P. McNamee
Represented By: Paul T. Farrell, Jr.
Represented By: Peter J. Mougey
Represented By: Peter H. Weinberger
Represented By: Rebecca D. Louks
Represented By: Robert R Miller
Represented By: Russell W. Budd
Represented By: William Hawal
Represented By: James C. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Ashland, OH
Represented By: Anthony J. Majestro
Represented By: Christine C. Mansour
Represented By: J Burton LeBlanc, IV
Represented By: John A Lancione
Represented By: Mark P Pifko
Represented By: Michael Jay Fuller, Jr
Represented By: Michael P. McNamee
Represented By: Paul T. Farrell, Jr.
Represented By: Peter J. Mougey
Represented By: Peter H. Weinberger
Represented By: Rebecca D. Louks
Represented By: Robert R Miller
Represented By: Russell W. Budd
Represented By: William Hawal
Represented By: James C. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Cleveland, Ohio
Represented By: Christine C. Mansour
Represented By: Anthony J. Majestro
Represented By: J Burton LeBlanc, IV
Represented By: John A Lancione
Represented By: Mark P Pifko
Represented By: Michael Jay Fuller, Jr
Represented By: Michael P. McNamee
Represented By: Paul T. Farrell, Jr.
Represented By: Peter J. Mougey
Represented By: Peter H. Weinberger
Represented By: Rebecca D. Louks
Represented By: Robert R Miller
Represented By: Russell W. Budd
Represented By: William Hawal
Represented By: James C. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Columbiana County Board of County Commissioners
Represented By: Anthony J. Majestro
Represented By: Christine C. Mansour
Represented By: J Burton LeBlanc, IV
Represented By: John A Lancione
Represented By: Mark P Pifko
Represented By: Michael Jay Fuller, Jr
Represented By: Michael P. McNamee
Represented By: Paul T. Farrell, Jr.
Represented By: Peter J. Mougey
Represented By: Peter H. Weinberger
Represented By: Rebecca D. Louks
Represented By: Robert R Miller
Represented By: Russell W. Budd
Represented By: William Hawal
Represented By: James C. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crawford County Board of County Commissioners
Represented By: Anthony J. Majestro
Represented By: Christine C. Mansour
Represented By: J Burton LeBlanc, IV
Represented By: John A Lancione
Represented By: Mark P Pifko
Represented By: Michael Jay Fuller, Jr
Represented By: Michael P. McNamee
Represented By: Paul T. Farrell, Jr.
Represented By: Peter J. Mougey
Represented By: Peter H. Weinberger
Represented By: Rebecca D. Louks
Represented By: Robert R Miller
Represented By: Russell W. Budd
Represented By: William Hawal
Represented By: James C. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erie County Board of County Commissioners
Represented By: Anthony J. Majestro
Represented By: Christine C. Mansour
Represented By: J Burton LeBlanc, IV
Represented By: John A Lancione
Represented By: Mark P Pifko
Represented By: Michael Jay Fuller, Jr
Represented By: Michael P. McNamee
Represented By: Paul T. Farrell, Jr.
Represented By: Peter J. Mougey
Represented By: Peter H. Weinberger
Represented By: Rebecca D. Louks
Represented By: Robert R Miller
Represented By: Russell W. Budd
Represented By: William Hawal
Represented By: James C. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geauga County Board of County Commissioners
Represented By: Anthony J. Majestro
Represented By: Christine C. Mansour
Represented By: J Burton LeBlanc, IV
Represented By: Mark P Pifko
Represented By: Michael Jay Fuller, Jr
Represented By: John A Lancione
Represented By: Michael P. McNamee
Represented By: Paul T. Farrell, Jr.
Represented By: Peter J. Mougey
Represented By: Peter H. Weinberger
Represented By: Rebecca D. Louks
Represented By: Robert R Miller
Represented By: Russell W. Budd
Represented By: William Hawal
Represented By: James C. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Huron County Board of County Commissioners
Represented By: Anthony J. Majestro
Represented By: Christine C. Mansour
Represented By: John A Lancione
Represented By: Mark P Pifko
Represented By: Michael Jay Fuller, Jr
Represented By: J Burton LeBlanc, IV
Represented By: Michael P. McNamee
Represented By: Paul T. Farrell, Jr.
Represented By: Peter J. Mougey
Represented By: Peter H. Weinberger
Represented By: Rebecca D. Louks
Represented By: Robert R Miller
Represented By: Russell W. Budd
Represented By: William Hawal
Represented By: James C. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marion County Board of County Commissioners
Represented By: Anthony J. Majestro
Represented By: Christine C. Mansour
Represented By: J Burton LeBlanc, IV
Represented By: John A Lancione
Represented By: Mark P Pifko
Represented By: Michael Jay Fuller, Jr
Represented By: Michael P. McNamee
Represented By: Paul T. Farrell, Jr.
Represented By: Peter J. Mougey
Represented By: Peter H. Weinberger
Represented By: Rebecca D. Louks
Represented By: Robert R Miller
Represented By: Russell W. Budd
Represented By: William Hawal
Represented By: James C. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mercer County Board of County Commissioners
Represented By: Anthony J. Majestro
Represented By: Christine C. Mansour
Represented By: J Burton LeBlanc, IV
Represented By: John A Lancione
Represented By: Mark P Pifko
Represented By: Michael Jay Fuller, Jr
Represented By: Michael P. McNamee
Represented By: Paul T. Farrell, Jr.
Represented By: Peter J. Mougey
Represented By: Peter H. Weinberger
Represented By: Rebecca D. Louks
Represented By: Robert R Miller
Represented By: Russell W. Budd
Represented By: William Hawal
Represented By: James C. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ottawa County Board of County Commissioners
Represented By: Anthony J. Majestro
Represented By: Christine C. Mansour
Represented By: J Burton LeBlanc, IV
Represented By: John A Lancione
Represented By: Mark P Pifko
Represented By: Michael Jay Fuller, Jr
Represented By: Michael P. McNamee
Represented By: Paul T. Farrell, Jr.
Represented By: Peter J. Mougey
Represented By: Peter H. Weinberger
Represented By: Rebecca D. Louks
Represented By: Robert R Miller
Represented By: Russell W. Budd
Represented By: William Hawal
Represented By: James C. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne County Board of County Commissioners
Represented By: Anthony J. Majestro
Represented By: Christine C. Mansour
Represented By: J Burton LeBlanc, IV
Represented By: John A Lancione
Represented By: Mark P Pifko
Represented By: Michael Jay Fuller, Jr
Represented By: Michael P. McNamee
Represented By: Paul T. Farrell, Jr.
Represented By: Peter J. Mougey
Represented By: Peter H. Weinberger
Represented By: Rebecca D. Louks
Represented By: Robert R Miller
Represented By: Russell W. Budd
Represented By: James C. Peterson
Represented By: William Hawal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Williams County Board of County Commissioners
Represented By: Anthony J. Majestro
Represented By: Christine C. Mansour
Represented By: J Burton LeBlanc, IV
Represented By: John A Lancione
Represented By: Mark P Pifko
Represented By: Michael Jay Fuller, Jr
Represented By: Michael P. McNamee
Represented By: Paul T. Farrell, Jr.
Represented By: Peter J. Mougey
Represented By: Peter H. Weinberger
Represented By: Rebecca D. Louks
Represented By: Robert R Miller
Represented By: Russell W. Budd
Represented By: William Hawal
Represented By: James C. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wyandot County Board of County Commissioners
Represented By: Anthony J. Majestro
Represented By: Christine C. Mansour
Represented By: J Burton LeBlanc, IV
Represented By: John A Lancione
Represented By: Mark P Pifko
Represented By: Michael Jay Fuller, Jr
Represented By: Michael P. McNamee
Represented By: Paul T. Farrell, Jr.
Represented By: Peter J. Mougey
Represented By: Peter H. Weinberger
Represented By: Rebecca D. Louks
Represented By: Robert R Miller
Represented By: Russell W. Budd
Represented By: William Hawal
Represented By: James C. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKinsey and Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?